Lenhard et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00403 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 5:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Lenhard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Lenhard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/01 9:54 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 02/07 8:30 AM
ORDER: The parties filed a Notice of Settlement on 2/6/2018. Doc.24 . Therefore, the Court ORDERS the parties to file their final settlement papers by Tuesday 3/6/2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/6/2018) (sss) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/06 3:25 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Allen, David) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/21 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather E Hall on behalf of John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hall, Heather) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/18 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Defendant's Supplemental Disclosures filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Allen, David) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 09/08 8:52 AM
Designation of Experts by John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard. (Oha, Chidi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Curriculum Vitae | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
ADR Summary
Mon 08/14 2:25 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: John Zachary Moseley and David G. Allen. Prv Fee: $ 700.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Sylvan, W) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order For ADR
Mon 06/05 3:52 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Joseph Sullivan Jaworski as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/8/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/5/2017) (epm) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 06/02 1:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard re:17 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (McClenny, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Thu 06/01 9:19 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2017, as to why the parties have failed to file the joint report naming a mediator. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/31/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 05/03 3:04 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karen Lenhard by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, David) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 05/03 3:03 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of John M. Lenhard by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, David) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 8:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 5/7/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 8/10/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2017. Motions due by 2/6/2018. Discovery due by 1/8/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/8/2017. Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/21/2017) (epm) Modified date on 4/24/2017 (epm) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Thu 03/23 4:08 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT EXPLANATION OF FAILURE TO FILE JOINT REPORT filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Joint Status Report | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 3:26 PM
NOTICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Allen, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 03/22 4:28 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties were required to submit a joint status report on or before March 21, 2017. See Doc. 10, Status Report Order. They did not. For that reason, the Court ORDERS the parties to show cause in writing no later than March 24, 2017, as to why they failed to comply with the Court's Status Report Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/22/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Status Report Order
Thu 02/23 2:38 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) must meet face-to-face at a mutually agreeable location, and no later than seven calendar days before the Joint Status Report due date.Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/23/2017) (ykp) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/22 5:28 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Motion. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. Plaintiffs may proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/22/2017) (chmb) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/22 5:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Allen, David) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/20 4:19 PM
MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard (Moseley, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/13 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant filed by John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard (Moseley, John) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John M Lenhard, Karen Lenhard. (Moseley, John) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
Boyle
Mon 02/13 12:54 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/13 11:32 AM
Certificate of Notice filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Allen, David) Modified text on 2/13/2017 |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 11:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 02/13 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 95th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-00505 filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8204150) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Allen, David) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened image on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 02/13 12:56 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Feb 13 12:56:04 CST 2017 (crt) |