Creuzot v. Green
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara M G Lynn |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00404 |
Nature of Suit | 450 Other Statutes - Commerce |
Cause | 28:1131ca Federal Question: Federal Communications Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 5:11 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Alvin Green
2613 Warren
Dallas, TX 75215 |
|
Counter Defendant
John C Creuzot
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alvin Green
2613 Warren
Dallas, TX 75215 |
|
Plaintiff
John C Creuzot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
73 | 73
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Fri 07/16 9:15 AM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to67 Notice of Appeal filed by Alvin Green. The appeal is DISMISSED in part and AFFIRMED in part. Issued as Mandate: 7/16/2021. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at[LINK:Exhibit Guide] ). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (ajb) |
|
72 | 72
appeal
USCA Opinion
Fri 07/16 9:14 AM
Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re67 Notice of Appeal filed by Alvin Green. The appeal is DISMISSED in part and AFFIRMED in part. (ajb) |