Pickett v. Aldi Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aldi Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Pickett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Acknowledgment of Case Transfer
Thu 02/23 3:05 PM
Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Eastern District of Texas Sherman Division as case number 4:17-cv-00134. (sss) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Transferring to Another District
Thu 02/23 11:50 AM
ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/22/2017) (sss) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Thu 02/23 11:52 AM
Interdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER . Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (sss) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 02/15 2:27 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aldi Inc. (Sargent, David) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/15 2:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Aldi Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sargent, David) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL filed by Aldi Inc (Sargent, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aldi Inc. (Sargent, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aldi Inc. (Sargent, David) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Kinkeade
Mon 02/13 2:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 02/13 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-00715 filed by Aldi, Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8205056) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sargent, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement |