United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Abio et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00411 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 5:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Abio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abio Financial Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Abstract of Judgment
Fri 10/13 12:03 PM
Abstract of Judgment issued. (cfk) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Abstract of Judgment
Fri 10/13 12:02 PM
Abstract of Judgment issued. (cfk) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Wed 01/29 10:16 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS JOHN ABIO, aka TRE BRANDENBERG, AND ABIO FINANCIAL GROUP, INC: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants are liable, jointly and severally, for profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $773,799, for a total of $3,873,799 disgorgement of $3,100,000.00. Defendant John Abio a/k/a Tre Brandenberg shall additionally pay a civil penalty in the amount of $100,000 pursuant to Section 21(d)(3) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/27/2020) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Judgment
Thu 01/09 11:52 AM
Joint MOTION for Judgment filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (O'Brien, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Consent to Entry of Judgment | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Judgment
Thu 09/07 4:45 PM
JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT ABIO FINANCIAL GROUP INC. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/7/2017) (axm) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
motion
Judgment
Fri 07/21 12:11 PM
Agreed MOTION for Judgment against Abio Financial Group, Inc. filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (O'Brien, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit(s) Proposed Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit(s) Consent and Corporate Resolution | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Wed 06/14 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN ABIO, aka TRE BRANDENBERG. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/14/2017) (ash) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
motion
Judgment
Tue 06/13 3:00 PM
Agreed MOTION for Judgment filed by United State Securities and Exchange Commission (O'Brien, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Proposed Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Consent of Defendant | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/30 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Continuing Settlement Discussions filed by John Abio, Abio Financial Group Inc (Dyer, David) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/15 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. John Abio answer due 5/30/2017; Abio Financial Group Inc answer due 5/30/2017. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/15/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 05/10 4:44 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by John Abio, Abio Financial Group Inc (Dyer, David) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/10 12:59 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer John Abio answer or response due 5/15/2017; Abio Financial Group, Inc. answer or response due 5/15/2017. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/10/2017) (chmb) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/10 10:38 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by John Abio, Abio Financial Group, Inc. (Little, J) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mitchell Little on behalf of John Abio, Abio Financial Group, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Little, J) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/01 9:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Abio Financial Group, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/14/2017. (Hanauer, Benjamin) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/01 9:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Abio. Waiver sent on 2/14/2017. (Hanauer, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 02/14 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Hanauer on behalf of United State Securities and Exchange Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hanauer, Benjamin) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to John Abio, Abio Financial Group, Inc. (ykp) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
qcref
Kinkeade
Tue 02/14 9:16 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 02/13 3:46 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet to1 Complaint by Plaintiff United State Securities and Exchange Commission. (Polish, Jonathan) Modified text on 2/14/2017 (ykp). |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United State Securities and Exchange Commission. (Polish, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by United State Securities and Exchange Commission. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Polish, Jonathan) |