Smith v. Fresenius Medical Care North America
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00415 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Fresenius Management Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Smith
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care North America
Terminated: 02/27/2017
|
|
Defendant
Fresenius Management Services LLC
Terminated: 08/08/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/28 2:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Roy Smith. (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 02/02 1:30 PM
ORDER: The court has been notified by the mediator, Ms. M. Beth Krugler, that this case has settled. The parties are therefore directed to file a stipulation or notice of dismissal, or agreed motion to dismiss with the United States District Clerk's Office by 3/5/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/2/2018) (sss) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
adr
ADR Summary
Thu 02/01 6:26 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by M Beth Krugler. Attorneys in Attendance: Susan Hutchison, James Robert Hudson, Jr. and Katrin Schatz. Prv Fee: $ 1300 per party. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Krugler, M) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 01/08 4:46 PM
Designation of Experts by Roy Smith. (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 12/20 9:33 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting26 Motion to Continue. This case is set for trial on this courts four-week docket beginning 9/4/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Motions due by 4/16/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 8/7/2018. Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/20/2017) (epm) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 12/20 9:05 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot24 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/20/2017) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Tue 12/19 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue and Extension of Pretrial Deadlines filed by Fresenius Management Services Inc (Uduebor Washington, Evbu) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
trial
Designation of Experts
Tue 12/05 4:42 PM
Designation of Experts by Fresenius Management Services Inc. (Schatz, Katrin) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 11/30 1:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Expert Designation Deadline filed by Deft Fresenius Management Services Inc. (Schatz, Katrin) Condensed text on 11/30/2017 (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Fri 11/03 12:14 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/3/2017) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/26 1:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Fresenius Management Services Inc, subpoena served to AIDS Outreach Center on 10/18/2017. (epm) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 10/23 4:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Mt. Hebron Victory Faith Center Church on 10/13/2017. (aaa) |
|
20 | 20
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 10/20 2:25 PM
PROOF of Service for Subpoena served on Parkland Health & Hospital System on 10/17/2017. (aaa) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 10/18 10:56 AM
Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Baylor Scott & Health System/Baylor All Saints on 10/12/2017. (ykp) (Main Document 19 replaced on 10/18/2017) (ykp) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 10/17 12:54 PM
Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Riverside Missionary Baptist Church on 10/12/2017. (ykp) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/17/2017) (ykp) |
|
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 10/17 12:52 PM
Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Baylor Health System on 10/13/2017. (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Protective Order
Tue 09/12 3:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order filed by Fresenius Management Services Inc (Schatz, Katrin) Modified text on 9/12/2017 |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/05 11:32 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT on Settlement Negotiations filed by Fresenius Management Services Inc. (Schatz, Katrin) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/30 8:45 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint, filed by Fresenius Management Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Uduebor Washington, Evbu) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/08 4:05 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fresenius Management Services Inc filed by Roy Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ran) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 08/08 3:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/8/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File
Mon 08/07 12:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Roy Smith (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 extra copy for filing | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order For ADR
Tue 06/06 11:58 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/2/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/6/2017) (svc) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 6/4/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2017. Dispositive and Nondispositive Motions due by 2/16/2018. Discovery due by 2/2/2018. Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 5/7/2018. Settlement Status Report due by 9/5/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2018 @ 02:30 PM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/6/2017) (svc) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/02 3:28 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Fresenius Management Services LLC. (Schatz, Katrin) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Status Report Order
Wed 05/03 3:12 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Conference shall take place no later than 5/18/2017. Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/3/2017) (epm) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/28 9:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresenius Management Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Bio-Medical Applications Management Company for Fresenius Management Services LLC. (Schatz, Katrin) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 04/28 8:45 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint, filed by Fresenius Management Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Katrin U Schatz added to party Fresenius Management Services LLC(pty:dft) (Schatz, Katrin) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/27 12:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fresenius Medical Care North America filed by Roy Smith. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Lindsay
Mon 02/13 5:20 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roy Smith. (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fresenius Medical Care North America filed by Roy Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8206836) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hutchison, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |