Mortuary Financial Services, Inc. v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00141 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:28 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Kraft Heinz Foods Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Mortuary Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Mortuary Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Kraft Heinz Foods Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kraft Foods Group Universal Life Insurance Plan
|
|
Defendant
Kraft Foods Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kraft Foods Group, Inc. Administrative Committee
|
|
Defendant
Kraft Heinz Foods Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shirley A Weinstein
|
|
Plaintiff
Mortuary Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 08/08 9:55 AM
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS2 Krafts' Motion to Dismiss. MFS's three ERISA claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling in a proper venue. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/8/2017) (skg) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply
Thu 03/16 2:44 PM
REPLY filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company re:2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Improper Venue) (Barcus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Opinion - Verizon, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Opinion - IBEW, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Opinion - Dull | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 1:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2017. Motions due by 9/18/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/19/2017. Discovery due by 8/18/2017. Pretrial Materials (Pretrial Order) due by 12/21/2017. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning on 1/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/15/2017) (baa) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Mon 03/13 12:22 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Barcus, John) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/03 3:06 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Mortuary Financial Services, Inc. re:2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Improper Venue) (Engfer, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 03/03 11:50 AM
RESPONSE filed by Mortuary Financial Services, Inc. re:2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Improper Venue) (Engfer, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 03/03 11:21 AM
Original ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Mortuary Financial Services, Inc.. Related document:3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,, First COUNTERCLAIM against Kraft Heinz Foods Company filed by Mortuary Financial Services, Inc. (Engfer, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/02 2:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 against Kraft Heinz Foods Company filed by Mortuary Financial Services, Inc.. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Engfer, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 02/21 11:43 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company re2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Improper Venue) (Barcus, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Tue 02/14 3:04 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 3/14/2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/14/2017) (baa) |
|
5 | 5
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Tue 02/14 10:03 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 2:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kraft Heinz Foods Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Kraft Heinz Company for Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Barcus, John) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 02/13 2:32 PM
Original ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Mortuary Financial Services, Inc. filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company (Barcus, John) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 02/13 2:30 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Improper Venue) () filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Barcus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 02/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 153rd Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, case number 153-289850-17 filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8205328) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Barcus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Original Petition (Filed), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Military Affidavits, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Letter Requesting Citations, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Original Petition (Served), | ||
Att: 11 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Cover Sheet Supplement |