Thrift Way, Inc. v. Meza et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00142 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Juan Antonio Meza
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thrift Way, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order Transferring to Another District
Wed 10/25 3:48 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER: Case transferred to Midland/Odessa Division of Western District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/25/2017) (bdb) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry)
Wed 10/25 3:52 PM
Interdistrict Transfer to Western District of Texas, Midland/Odessa Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER . Counsel advised to file future documents in Western District of Texas. (bdb) |
||
misc
Acknowledgment of Case Transfer
Wed 10/25 4:14 PM
Case transferred from Texas Northern has been opened in Western District of Texas as case 7:17-cv-00209, filed 10/25/2017. (tln) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Transfer Case Out of District/Division
Fri 10/20 10:40 AM
Joint MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Joint Motion To Transfer Venue to the United States District Court For The Western District Of Texas filed by United States of America (Seward, Steven) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply
Fri 06/16 9:42 AM
REPLY filed by United States of America re:21 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants (Seward-DOJ, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 05/31 3:27 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Thrift Way, Inc. (Wilson, A) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply
Tue 04/25 4:10 PM
REPLY filed by United States of America re:19 Response/Objection (Seward-DOJ, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 04/17 2:19 PM
RESPONSE filed by Thrift Way, Inc. re:17 MOTION Dismiss, Stay or in the Alternative, to Transfer Action re1 Complaint,,,, (Wilson, A) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 04/13 5:14 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re17 MOTION Dismiss, Stay or in the Alternative, to Transfer Action re1 Complaint,,,, (Seward-DOJ, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/13 5:10 PM
MOTION Dismiss, Stay or in the Alternative, to Transfer Action re1 Complaint,,,, filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party United States of America added.Attorney Steven Earl Seward-DOJ added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Seward-DOJ, Steven) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned
Mon 02/27 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Juan Antonio Meza ; served on 2/23/2017. (Wilson, A) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned
Fri 02/17 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Wilson, A) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned
Fri 02/17 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Wilson, A) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned
Fri 02/17 10:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Wilson, A) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned
Fri 02/17 10:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America ; served on 2/15/2017. (Wilson, A) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 4:22 PM
Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. (wrb) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:36 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:35 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:35 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:34 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 02/14 1:34 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/13 4:56 PM
Summons issued as to Juan Antonio Meza, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wrb) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Means
Mon 02/13 4:54 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Wilson, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Juan Antonio Meza filed by Thrift Way, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8205544) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wilson, A) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Legal Description, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Deed of Trust, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet |