Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio v. Matthew N. Boussina
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00704 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 3:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Matthew N Boussina
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Martin H. Dodd
Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP 180 Sansome Street 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Plaintiff
Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 12/07 2:32 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 12/07 10:36 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER stipulation for dismisal filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/06 8:10 AM
ORDER STAYING ACTION AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/6/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/05 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio Notice of Conditional Settlement (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
adr
Certification of ADR Session
Wed 08/30 1:17 PM
Amended Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Martin H. Dodd: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on August 21, 2017, and subsequent telephone calls. The case settled. Mediation is complete. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
adr
Certification of ADR Session
Tue 08/22 2:51 PM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Martin H. Dodd: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on August 21, 2017. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are not expected. Mediation is complete. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017) Modified on 8/22/2017 (af, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/14 3:20 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 8/21/2017 09:30 AM., at the U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Thu 07/06 2:13 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Martin H. Dodd as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Notice of Need for Mediation - ADA Cases Only
Wed 06/21 10:15 AM
Notice of Need for Mediation by Richard Allen Mac Bride (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 6/21/2017) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Wed 06/21 1:06 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation13 . The deadline to complete the mediation is September 19, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/21 4:05 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time under F.R.C.P. 12(f). (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 03/20 2:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/13 6:00 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew N Boussina.. (Allman, Sara) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/13 5:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMatthew N Boussina. (Allman, Sara) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/03 2:50 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 3/3/2017) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 03/03 2:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/17/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 03/01 1:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio as against defendant Matthew N. Boussina (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Matthew N Boussina. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Tue 02/14 8:34 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 02/13 7:26 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 02/13 12:10 AM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 12:09 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11150366.). Filed byJose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.(Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |