Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Referred: James P Donohue
Case #: 2:17-cv-00218
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2017 12:50 AM PST
Petitioner
Daniel Ramirez Medina
Represented By
Judy London
Public Counsel
contact info
Luis Cortes Romero
Barrera Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Ethan D. Dettmer
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (sf)
contact info
Anne M. Hudson-Price
Public Counsel
contact info
Katherine Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
John Barrera
Barrera Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Laurence H. Tribe
contact info
Matt Adams
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project (sea)
contact info
Elizabeth Hadaway
Public Counsel
contact info
Mary Elizabeth Hawkins
Hawkins Law Group PLLC
contact info
Mark D. Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
Jose Garcia
Barrera Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Jesse S. Gabriel
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Erwin Chemerinsky
Uc Irvine School Of Law
contact info
Kathryn A. Eidman
Public Counsel
contact info
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Respondent
Nathalie Asher
Represented By
Jeffrey S Robins
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Respondent
John Kelly
Represented By
Jeffrey S Robins
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Respondent
US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Jeffrey S Robins
contact info
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Respondent
Warden
Represented By
US Attorney Habeas
contact info

Docket last updated: 02/22/2017 11:59 PM PST
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
46 46 misc Response (non motion) Wed 11:43 PM
RESPONSE by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina re39 Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Order on Motion for Leave,,, re Jurisdiction Over The Habeas Petition (Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11:39 PM
Emergency MOTION Conditional Release Pending Final Determination , filed by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina. Noting Date 2/22/2017, (Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Katherine Marquart,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F-1,
Att: 8 Exhibit F-2,
Att: 9 Exhibit F-3,
Att: 10 Exhibit G-1,
Att: 11 Exhibit G-2,
Att: 12 Exhibit G-3,
Att: 13 Exhibit H,
Att: 14 Exhibit I-1,
Att: 15 Exhibit I-2,
Att: 16 Exhibit I-3,
Att: 17 Exhibit J,
Att: 18 Exhibit K,
Att: 19 Exhibit L,
Att: 20 Exhibit M,
Att: 21 Exhibit N,
Att: 22 Proposed Order
44 44 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 5:13 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Leah M. Litman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4779654 (Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Wed 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the status Hearing held on 2/17/2017 before Judge James P. Donohue. Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at [LINK:www.wawd.uscourts.gov] . To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2017, (NB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
42 42 service Certificate of Service Tue 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina re41 Amended Petition, (Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
41 41 cmp Amended Petition Tue 11:56 AM
AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF , filed by Daniel Ramirez Medina.(Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Friday, February 17, 2017
40 40 minutes Status Conference Fri 3:10 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. James P. Donohue- Dep Clerk: A. Elkington; Pla Counsel: Theodore Boutrous Jr., Mark Rosenbaum, Ethan Dettmer, Elizabeth Hadaway, Luis cortez Romero; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Robins; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 10:00; Courtroom: 12A;Status Conference held on 2/17/2017. Court reviews status of case and briefing filed by the parties. Court hears from the parties regarding, release/detention, general jurisdiction, merits of petition. For reasons stated on the record, the Court finds: Immediate release denied due to lack of jurisdiction; Petitioner to apply for a bond hearing before an Immigration Judge. Hearing to take place within one week from today. Court STRIKES previously set scheduling order and sets an accelerated briefing schedule, order posted 39 . Court addresses consent procedures. Unopposed Motion for Amicus Curiae Brief - ALLOWED. Petitioner is directed to file an Amended Petition by 12:00 PM on Tuesday 2/21/2017. Oral Argument Hearing set for 3/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. James P. Donohue. (AE) Modified on 2/17/2017 (KMP)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order on Motion for Leave ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 1:25 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. James P. Donohue. Petitioner's motion for immediate release from the ongoing removal proceedings is DENIED. Expedited bond hearing before an Immigration Judge to be requested no later than 2/21/2017 at noon. If requested, respondents shall arrange for Mr. Ramirez to have a bond hearing before an Immigration Judge by Friday, 2/24/2017. Amended habeas petition due by 2/21/2017 at noon. Government's motion to dismiss on jurisdictional grounds is due by Friday, 2/24/2017 at 5:00 p.m; Response due 3/3/2017 by 5:00 p.m.; Reply due 3/7/2017 at noon. Oral argument on the Government's motion to dismiss to be held on 3/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A. The unopposed motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief by United We Dream, Dkt.38 , is GRANTED. (PM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
38 38 motion Leave Thu 10:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief , filed by Amicus United We Dream. Noting Date 2/16/2017, (Rummage, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen M. Rummage on behalf of Amicus United We Dream. (Rummage, Stephen)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 9:27 PM
DECLARATION of Jesse Gabriel re34 Brief - Responsive by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina(Gabriel, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter from Consul of Mexico
35 35 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 5:23 PM
DECLARATION re34 Brief - Responsive by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina(Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Ramirez Medina,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Josue L.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Luz L. (English),
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Luz L. (Spanish),
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Nancy L.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of VIRIDIANA SARAHI CHABOLLA MENDOZA,
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Martin Flores,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Edwina Barvosa,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Ethan Dettmer,
Att: 10 Exhibit Declaration of Luis Cortes Romero,
Att: 11 Exhibit Declaration of Jesse Gabriel
34 34 misc Brief - Responsive Thu 5:12 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re30 Order Directing Service,, by Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina. (Boutrous, Theodore)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron S Goldsmith on behalf of Respondents Nathalie Asher, John Kelly, US Department of Homeland Security, Warden. (Goldsmith, Aaron)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Brief Thu 8:55 AM
BRIEF re30 Order Directing Service,, by Respondents Nathalie Asher, John Kelly, US Department of Homeland Security, Warden(Robins, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice to Appear,
Att: 2 Exhibit DACA Notice of Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit Form I-213,
Att: 4 Exhibit Custody Determination
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 2:02 PM
Attorney Ambika K Doran for United We Dream added; per37 Notice of Appearance. (swt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of Respondents Nathalie Asher, John Kelly, US Department of Homeland Security. (Robins, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order Directing Service Tue 12:32 PM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, AND SETTING BRIEFINGSCHEDULE by Hon. James P. Donohue. Electronic posting of this Order and petitioners 2241 habeas petition shall effect service upon the United States Attorney of the petition and all supporting documents. Service upon the United States Attorney is deemed to be service upon DHS, the Secretary of DHS, the ICE Seattle Field Office Director, and the Warden of the Northwest Detention Center. The Court will hold a status conference at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, February 17, 2017, in Courtroom 12A at the U.S. District Courthouse in Seattle, Washington. (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings Tue 1:07 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. James P. Donohue. Respondents Brief due by 9:00 a.m. on 2/16/2017, Petitioner may file a response to respondents' brief by 5:00 p.m. 2/16/2017.(AE)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
29 29 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 3:52 PM
ORDER re17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Barrera for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. Note: John Barrera maintains an office outside the Western District of Washington, physical address of 623 11th Avenue S., Nampa, ID 83651.No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 3:51 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jose Garcia for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. Note: Jose Garcia maintains an office outside the Western District of Washington, physical address of 320 N. Johnson St., Suite 600, Kennewick, WA 99336. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:42 PM
ORDER re15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:37 PM
ORDER re14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erwin Chemerinsky for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:31 PM
ORDER re13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kathryn A. Eidman for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:24 PM
ORDER re11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jesse S. Gabriel for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:16 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth Hadaway for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:58 PM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anne M. Hudson-Price for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:57 PM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Judy London for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:54 PM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine Marquart for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:48 PM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Luis Cortes Romero for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:44 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark D. Rosenbaum for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:41 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John C. Barrera FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767312 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:40 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence H. Tribe for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:40 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767301 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:36 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erwin Chemerinsky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767294 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:35 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathryn A. Eidman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767286 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:33 PM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ethan D. Dettmer for Daniel Ramirez Medina, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:33 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jesse S. Gabriel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767280 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:31 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jose Garcia FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767273 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:29 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth Hadaway FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767265 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:27 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anne M. Hudson-Price FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767263 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:25 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Judy London FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767252 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:22 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine M. Marquart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767243 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:20 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Luis Cortes Romero FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767236 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:18 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Rosenbaum FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767228 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:16 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence Tribe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767216 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12:09 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ethan Dettmer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Daniel Ramirez Medina (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4767181 (Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 9:40 AM
2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Related [+], filed by Daniel Ramirez Medina.(Hawkins, Mary)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4766629
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Notice to Filer Mon 11:18 AM
NOTICE to Filer: the incorrect divisional office was selected upon case opening, 3:17-cv-5110. This case is now assigned a Seattle case number and judge(s). All future documents shall bear the following: 2:17-cv-00218 RSM/JPD. Thank you. (MET)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Mon 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Clerk added US Attorney Habeas and regenerated the notice of filing. (SG)
Related: [-]