Blackberry Limited v. Nokia Corporation et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00155 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 38:2011 - Veteran's Readjustment Assistance Act of |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nokia Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nokia Solutions and Networks Holdings USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Black Berry Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
106 | 106
3
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Thu 11/08 4:27 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,996,418; 8,254,246; 8,494,090; 7,529,305; 8,861,433; 9,426,697; 9,253,772; 8,897,192; 9,125,202; 8,243,683; 8,644,829.(nms) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Order | ||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
105 | 105
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/07 4:09 PM
SO ORDERED Granting103 Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2018. (nms) |
|
104 | 104
order
Oral Order
Wed 11/07 2:45 PM
ORAL ORDER re 84 Oral Order Setting Teleconference: The teleconference set for 11/15/18 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/7/18. (cak) |
|
103 | 103
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/07 2:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, by BlackBerry Limited. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/7/2018 (nms) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
102 | 102
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Mon 11/05 12:13 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines, by BlackBerry Limited. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/5/2018 (nms) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 11/05 4:30 PM
SO ORDERED, re102 Stipulated Order to extend scheduling order deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2018. (nms) |