Express Mobile, Inc. v. KTree Computer Solutions Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 4:42 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
KTree Computer Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Express Mobile, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KTree Computer Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Express Mobile, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 06/13 2:39 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (slo, ) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 06/13 2:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/13/2017. (slo, ) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/05 9:11 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by KTree Computer Solutions Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/4/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 05/01 9:43 AM
ALL FUTURE DOCKET ENTRIES (EXCEPT VENUE) SHOULD BE MADE TO LEAD CASE. (slo, ) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Mon 05/01 9:32 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER: The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:17-cv-00130. ALL FUTURE DOCKET ENTRIES SHOULD BE MADE TO LEAD CASE (EXCEPT VENUE). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/28/2017. (slo, ) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/27 4:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Andre Kruetzfeldt filed by Express Mobile, Inc. . (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 04/27 4:51 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Express Mobile, Inc. . (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 04/20 4:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by KTree Computer Solutions Inc. . (Lamb, William) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/13 11:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Andre Kruetzfeldt filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/13 11:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Steve Rempell filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/13 11:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Timothy Devlin filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 04/13 12:02 AM
FILED IN ERROR 17 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 4/13/2017 (nkl, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 04/13 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the AFFIDAVIT in Opposition submitted document18 19 20 does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 04/13 11:06 AM
***FILED IN ERROR - a proposed order should not be filed on the docket as a separate entry. Document # 21, Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/12 11:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Andre Kruetzfeldt filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/12 11:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Steve Rempell filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/12 11:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Express Mobile, Inc. .(Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/12 11:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Express Mobile, Inc. . (Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Devlin on behalf of Express Mobile, Inc. (Devlin, Timothy) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
Fri 04/07 3:10 PM
Letter Brief filed by Express Mobile, Inc.(Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Letter Brief | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 03/27 9:51 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter Response and to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/25/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/23 11:07 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter Response and to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Express Mobile, Inc..(Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/16 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Cathryne Jacob on behalf of Express Mobile, Inc. (Jacob, Mary) |
|
11 | 11
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Thu 03/16 2:16 PM
RESPONSE to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 12:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KTree Computer Solutions Inc. (Lamb, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 03/15 2:04 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by KTree Computer Solutions Inc..(Lamb, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/02 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amit Agarwal on behalf of KTree Computer Solutions Inc. (Agarwal, Amit) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 02/24 6:00 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 02/23 5:03 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KTree Computer Solutions Inc.. (Lamb, William) |
|
6 | 6
23
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 02/23 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Express Mobile, Inc. by KTree Computer Solutions Inc..(Lamb, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/14 4:14 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to KTree Computer Solutions Inc. c/o its Registered Agent Shaik Ismail Basha. (nkl, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/14 3:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KTree Computer Solutions Inc. (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 02/14 3:38 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kiddie, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against KTree Computer Solutions Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6156135.), filed by KTree Computer Solutions Inc..(Kiddie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 105 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/14 3:44 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 02/14 3:45 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |