Jingles v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00423 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Jingles
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 07/20 12:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated per12 Notice of Dismissal and DJ chambers. (axm) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/19 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Sherry Jingles (Kricken, Wade) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 3:25 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2017. Motions due by 1/3/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/15/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/14 12:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Bennion, Kodie) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 02/22 10:17 AM
Appendix in Support filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association re8 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bennion, Kodie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) App. 001- 027 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 02/22 10:16 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association re7 MOTION to Dismiss (Bennion, Kodie) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/22 10:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Bennion, Kodie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Thu 02/16 3:09 PM
ORDER Directing Joint Status Report: Lead counsel for the parties shall meet or confer by telephone and file a joint status report within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 2/16/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Tue 02/14 1:14 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Sidney A Fitzwater recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:17-cv-0423-K. (ash) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Tue 02/14 12:06 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sidney A Fitzwater for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:17-cv-0423-D. (ash) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Tue 02/14 11:42 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/14 10:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bennion, Kodie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 02/14 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-01325 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8207937) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lewis, Wm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/14 2:17 PM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney per chambers. Modified text on 2/14/2017 |