Tubb et al v. Johnson & Johnson Services Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00426 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marga Tubb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen G Tubb
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/16 12:07 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Stanley Saladyk, Teresa A Saladyk, Edward Roe, Sharon L Roe, Layne Yvonne Martin, Sandra Smith, Andrey Motsny, James B Hale, Sharon Hale, Albert Jones, Janet M Jones, Judith Boldry, Verlin Dean Boldry, James E Phillips, Jr, Margaret A Phillips, Helen A Roadarmel, Robert Roadarmel, Marga Tubb, Stephen G Tubb. (Harrison, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 05/13 5:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified that this case has settled. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers as soon as the settlement is fully consummated. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/13/2022) (chmb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/13 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint Notice) filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Products Inc, DePuy Products Inc (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Case List | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/14 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marga Tubb, Stephen G Tubb identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate DePuy Products for Marga Tubb, Stephen G Tubb. (Tuegel, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Marga Tubb, Stephen G Tubb. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8209039) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Tuegel, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Related Case |