Stanbury v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00427 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 3:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan F. Stanbury
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/21 1:27 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by DePuy International Ltd, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 12/29 12:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation of Dismissal. (twd) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 02/14 2:05 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:17-cv-00019. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Transferring to Another District
Tue 02/14 10:46 AM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-260) transferring case to: Northern District of Texas, MDL case number: 2244. (AG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 4 motion to stay. This case is STAYED pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Additionally, Defendants' obligation to respond to the Complaint is stayed pending the MDL Panel's decision. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Any party may move to return this case to active status at any time. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 1/6/2017. (GAG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] | |
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint , Unopposed MOTION to stay by DePuy Orthepaedics, Inc.. (Walz, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] | |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against DePuy Orthepaedics, Inc., Depuy International, LTD., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Jan F. Stanbury. Filed in state court on 12/1/16.(JNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit in and for Manatee County, Florida, case number 2016 CA 5269 filed in State Court on 12/1/16. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA41007 filed by Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy International, LTD., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Orthepaedics, Inc..(JNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/14/2017.] | |
Att: 1 State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |