Iron Oak Technologies LLC v. Lenovo (United States) Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00429 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 3:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lenovo (United States) Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lenovo Holding Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iron Oak Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lenovo Group Ltd
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Fri 06/02 8:34 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/01 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC (McAughan, Robert) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 06/02 8:27 AM
Civil Case Terminated per28 Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. |
||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 05/11 4:01 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc re26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Klein, Eric) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/11 3:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc (Klein, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply
Thu 05/11 3:52 PM
REPLY filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc re:19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) (Klein, Eric) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/05 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lenovo Holding Company Inc for Lenovo (United States) Inc; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lenovo Group Ltd, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lenovo Technology (United Kingdom) Limited for Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (Klein, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/28 2:08 PM
RESPONSE filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC re:19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) (Terrell, David) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/27 2:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Terrell, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 04/12 4:08 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc re19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) ,20 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Klein, Eric) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 04/12 4:06 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc re19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) (Klein, Eric) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/12 4:05 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) () filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc (Klein, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/11 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iron Oak Technologies LLC. (McAughan, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Tue 04/11 2:42 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Iron Oak Technologies LLC. (Terrell, David) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/27 9:39 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. [ECF No.15 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff Iron Oak Technologies, LLC, is allowed to proceed in this action without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/27/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/21 5:27 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC (Deaver, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/21 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J Klein on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Klein, Eric) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/21 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Simons on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Simons, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/21 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred I Williams on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Fred) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Tue 03/21 2:55 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint report due by 4/11/2017. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 Rule 16 Agenda | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/16 2:42 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Certain Defendants by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (Williams, Fred) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/15 4:50 PM
ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion: The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 4/12/2017. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/15/2017) (twd) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/14 6:31 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company IncAttorney Fred I Williams added to party Lenovo (United States) Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Fred I Williams added to party Lenovo Group Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Fred I Williams added to party Lenovo Holding Company Inc(pty:dft) (Williams, Fred) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned
Tue 02/28 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lenovo Holding Company Inc ; served on 2/22/2017. (McAughan, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned
Tue 02/28 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lenovo (United States) Inc ; served on 2/22/2017. (McAughan, Robert) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 02/17 3:56 PM
ORDER: The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Barbara M.G. Lynn for possible consolidation. All future pleadings shall be filed under case No. 3:17-CV-0429-M. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Tue 02/14 4:49 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sss) (Main Document 4 replaced to correct clerical error on 2/14/2017) (sss) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Godbey
Tue 02/14 4:45 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Lenovo Holding Company Inc. filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8210178) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McAughan, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 8 Cover Sheet |