Iron Oak Technologies LLC v. Pantech Wireless Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00430 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Pantech Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Pantech Wireless Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Iron Oak Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Tue 03/21 4:31 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (twd) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC (Deaver, Albert) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 03/21 1:47 PM
ORDER: Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff Iron Oak Technologies LLC, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) or, pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a), a motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/21/2017) (twd) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/21 4:29 PM
Civil Case Terminated per6 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (twd) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/15 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Pantech Co Ltd, Pantech Wireless Inc. |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Wed 02/15 9:34 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Lynn
Wed 02/15 9:27 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Modified date filed on 2/15/2017 |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Pantech Co. Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc. filed by Iron Oak Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8210465) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McAughan, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 8 Cover Sheet |