Givens v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Referred: | Hal R Ray, Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00145 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Christy Givens
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Judgment
Wed 04/25 4:51 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. All claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to their refiling. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne by the party incurring them. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/25/2018) (bdb) |
|
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 04/25 4:49 PM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S30 FINDINGS AND CONCLUSIONS: It is, therefore, ORDERED that the commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/25/2018) (bdb) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 03/30 3:15 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, NOTICE, AND ORDER: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge Means AFFIRM the Commissioner's decision. Under 28 U.S.C. § 636, it is hereby ORDERED that each party shall have until April 13, 2018, to serve and file written objections to the United States Magistrate Judge's proposed findings, conclusions, and recommendation. It is further ORDERED that if objections are filed and the opposing party chooses to file a response, the response shall be filed within seven (7) days of the filing date of the objections. It is further ORDERED that the above-styled and numbered action, previously referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for findings, conclusions, and recommendation, be and hereby is returned to the docket of the United States District Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/30/2018) (plp) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 12/05 10:56 AM
RESPONSE filed by Christy Givens re:28 Response/Objection (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 11/20 3:06 PM
RESPONSE filed by Nancy A Berryhill re:27 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Chandler, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 10/19 2:59 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Christy Givens re26 Order directing filing of briefs (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/11 9:10 AM
ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS: It is ORDERED that the parties shall submit briefs in accordance with the following schedule and requirements: See order for specifics. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/11/2017) (plp) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Administrative Record
Tue 10/10 3:33 PM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Chandler, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s) | ||
24 | 24
misc
Administrative Record
Tue 10/10 3:20 PM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Chandler, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s) | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/10 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Chandler, Thomas) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/10 2:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas E Chandler added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Chandler, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned
Tue 08/08 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration - Interested Party ; served on 8/8/2017. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) file stamped received summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) file stamped received complaint | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/03 1:26 PM
Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (bdb) |
|
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/03 8:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Attorney for the Northern District of Texas Fort Worth Division filed by Christy Givens. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) alias summons | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned
Thu 07/27 5:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Certified mail return receipt cards, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Wed 07/26 1:48 PM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that if Plaintiff desires to pursue her claim against Defendant, Plaintiff shall file either proof of proper service as required by Rule 4.1 of the Local Civil Rules of the Northern District of Texas and Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or an instrument in affidavit form establishing good cause why such proof cannot be filed no later than August 4, 2017. Responses due by 8/4/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/26/2017) (skg) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/26 10:27 AM
Clerk declines to issue Entry of Default based on insufficient service per chambers. (edm) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Mon 07/24 3:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Christy Givens. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned
Fri 05/19 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) certified mail cards, | ||
Att: 2 summons | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 05/08 10:33 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process (ECF No.13 ), filed May 7, 2017. After reviewing the pleadings and applicable law, the Court finds that Plaintiffs Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on Defendant and file proof of proper service as required by Rule 4.1 of the Local Civil Rules of the Northern District of Texas and Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before May 30, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/8/2017) (plp) |
|
Sunday, May 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Sun 05/07 3:31 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time to serve process filed by Christy Givens (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Wed 05/03 2:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT regarding service of process by Christy Givens. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 05/02 3:48 PM
ORDER: Therefore, it is ORDERED that if Plaintiff desires to pursue her claim against Defendant, Plaintiff shall file either proof of proper service as required by Rule 4.1 of the Local Civil Rules of the Northern District of Texas and Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or an instrument in affidavit form establishing good cause why such proof cannot be filed no later than May 16, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/2/2017) (plp) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/19 10:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christy Givens (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/17 9:24 AM
Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (plp) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 9:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEEDIN FORMA PAUPERIS: After reviewing the pleadings and applicable law, the Court concludes that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No.2 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The clerk shall file Plaintiff's pleadings without prepayment of costs or security therefor; 2. The clerk shall issue summons and electronically deliver it to the Plaintiff for service on the Defendant; 3. Plaintiff shall perfect service on the Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/17/2017) (plp) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/16 10:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christy Givens (Ray, Alfred) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 02/15 8:45 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No.2 ), filed February 14, 2017. Although Plaintiff's Motion states that "Plaintiff has completed and signed the Affidavit required by this Court[,]" Plaintiff failed to include the requisite Affidavit in her pleadings. ECF No. 2. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff file the Affidavit required to proceed in forma pauperis if she intends to pursue this Motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/15/2017) (plp) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
qcref
Means
Tue 02/14 11:15 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. File to: Judge Ray. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (hth) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 02/14 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Patrick Ray, III for Daniel W. McDonald on behalf of Christy Givens. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/14 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christy Givens. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File
Tue 02/14 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to File In Forma Pauperis filed by Christy Givens with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ray, Alfred) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christy Givens. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Alfred) |