Slayton v. Cogdill et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | E Scott Frost |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00006 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 10/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Billy Wayne Slayton. New address: TDCJ East Texas Treatment Facility, P.O. Box 8000, Henderson, TX 75653. (pnp) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Public Correspondence Received
Mon 08/17 1:50 PM
Public correspondence addressed to judge, deputy clerk response attached, received from Billy Wayne Slayton. (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 Clerk response ltr | ||
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Public Correspondence Received
Tue 01/07 2:22 PM
Public correspondence filed, deputy clerk response attached, received from Billy Wayne Slayton. (dsr) (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 2nd letter | ||
Att: 2 (1/7/2020) Clk ltr | ||
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Request
Mon 11/04 3:25 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton, Deputy Clerk mailed public docket sheet to Slayton. (dsr) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 09/06 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address and public correspondence for Pro Se litigant Billy Wayne Slayton, with clerk response. New address: TDCJ Telford, 3899 State Hwy 98, New Boston, TX 75570. (dsr) (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 (9/6/2019) Clk ltr | ||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Request
Mon 02/25 5:12 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton with Deputy Clerk Response. (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 clerk response ltr | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Request
Wed 11/01 3:54 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton. No response is necessary as this case was closed and orders mailed on 10/27/2017. (dsr) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/27 10:58 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is Ordered, Adjudged, and Decreed that Slayton's claims in this case against all defendants are Dismissed as Frivolous. This judgment shall be a final judgment as to the claims dismissed. So Ordered. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 10/27/2017) (dsr) |
|
21 | 21
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 10/27 9:56 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Because Slayton has not sufficiently pleaded that any defendant acted maliciously to cause harm or knew of and ignored a substantial risk of serious harm, his claims are Dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted as against all defendants pursuant to § 1915(e)(2)(B). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 10/27/2017) (dsr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 10/27 9:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 21. mailed to Plaintiff. Fri Oct 27 09:58:22 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 10/27 10:59 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 22. mailed to Plaintiff. Fri Oct 27 10:59:18 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Request
Thu 08/03 4:25 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton. Clerk mailed public docket sheet to Mr. Slayton. (dsr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 08/03 4:28 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailing label only. Thu Aug 3 16:28:18 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/22 4:12 PM
NOTICE/letter received from Billy Wayne Slayton advising that he received notice that Judge Frost is now the judge on his case. No response is necessary by the Clerk. (dsr) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Request
Thu 06/08 2:08 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton. Deputy Clerk mailed courtesy copy of public docket sheet showing Judge Frost as the presiding judge. (dsr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 06/08 2:10 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailing label only. Thu Jun 8 14:10:51 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
misc
Prisoner/Social Security Consent
Mon 05/08 2:34 PM
Prisoner Consent by Billy Wayne Slayton to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (dsr) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
misc
Prisoner/Social Security Consent
Mon 05/01 2:39 PM
Prisoner Consent by Billy Wayne Slayton to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dss) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/26 3:07 PM
NOTICE filed by Billy Wayne Slayton that he has been returned to the Formby Unit, but has not yet received the Consent form from the Court. (dsr) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/19 2:12 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) mailing label to send the Consent to Proceed Before the U.S. Magistrate Judge to Plaintiff. Additional copy sent to Plaintiff at the TDCJ French Robertson Unit, Abilene, Texas on Wed Apr 19 14:12:09 CDT 2017 (crt) Expanded text on 4/19/2017 (dsr) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
minutes
Evidentiary Hearing
Wed 04/19 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/18/2017. Case called. Plaintiff admonished of his right to consent to proceed before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent previously not given. Plaintiff sworn by and questioned by Judge Frost. Testimony commenced. Appropriate orders to be entered by the Court and copies mailed to Plaintiff. Consent being re-mailed to plaintiff at the Plainview address. Hearing adjourned. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - n/a; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :17. (dsr) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Request
Mon 04/10 2:44 PM
Status Request by Billy Wayne Slayton. Clerk mailed courtesy copy of the public docket sheet addressed to Slayton at the address listed on the docket sheet. (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 attachment ltr with envelope | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/10 2:45 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailing label only. Mon Apr 10 14:45:46 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 03/27 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Billy Wayne Slayton. New address: TDCJ Formby Unit, 998 CR AA, Plainview, Texas 79072. (dsr) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/24 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Receipt of Records from Coleman County Sheriff's Office re:9 Order. (Originals sent to ESF chambers.) (dsr) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 3:57 PM
NOTICE of receipt of Records from the Runnels County Sheriff's Department re:9 Order. (dsr) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 03/07 5:04 PM
ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/18/2017 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2000, 341 Pine St., Abilene, TX 79601-5928 before Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost, via video teleconferencing. TDCJ officials are instructed to have Pltf present at a TDCJ facility w/ video teleconferencing capabilities for participation in the above-scheduled hearing, and, if required, to make available an interpreter to translate the proceedings. Coleman County Sheriff's Department and Runnels County Jail officials are to furnish the Court w/authenticated copies of relevant institutional records pertaining to allegations in Plntf's complaint on or before March 28, 2017; if the records are not received by that date, the court will require that counsel attend the hearing and be prepared to answer any questions the court may have regarding Plntfs complaint; An administrator or other appropriate official may attend the hearing for Defts, however, attendance is not mandatory. Clerk shall mail copy of this order to Pltf, and a copy of Pltf's complaint & any amended or supplemental complaint to the above listed officials; however, no answer is required at this time as no service of process has yet been issued. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/7/2017) (dsr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/07 5:08 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. mailed to Plaintiff, and copies of Docs [1,8,9] sent to all other parties named in the Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing. Tue Mar 7 17:08:10 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 03/01 2:18 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Billy Wayne Slayton. (dsr) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 02/24 11:16 AM
Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost added. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (ali) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 02/23 1:06 PM
ORDER: Case transferred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, U.S. Magistrate Judge, for further proceedings. The Magistrate Judge shall conduct a Spears Hearing, if feasible, and advise Plaintiff of the availability of the Magistrate Judge to exercise jurisdiction to conduct proceedings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/23/2017) (dsr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order For Partial Filing Fee ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 02/23 11:13 AM
PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee; however, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full $350.00 filing pursuant to the PLRA. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit to Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. Motions terminated:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Billy Wayne Slayton. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/23/2017) (dsr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 02/23 11:14 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6. mailed to Plaintiff. Thu Feb 23 11:14:47 CST 2017 (crt) Modified on 2/23/2017 (dsr) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 02/23 1:06 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 7. mailed to Plaintiff. Thu Feb 23 13:06:55 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/22 9:26 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Feb 22 09:26:18 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 02/22 9:25 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint is pending judicial screening pursuant to 28 USC 1915. For the reasons set forth in the Order, the motion of Pltf. for appt. of counsel is denied without prejudice to Pltf's right to request appointment of counsel should circumstances change. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/22/2017) (dss) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 02/14 3:25 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (dsr) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Tue 02/14 3:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/14 3:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Billy Wayne Slayton. (dsr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/14 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Les Cogdill, Wade Turner filed by Billy Wayne Slayton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 cover ltr & env | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/14 3:26 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 3, 4. mailed to Plaintiff. Tue Feb 14 15:26:23 CST 2017 (crt) |