Joint Admin
|
2:17-bk-10354 - Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, LLC
|
01/30/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01021 - Kusnick et al v. LMCHH PCP LLC et al
|
02/05/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01024 - King et al v. LMCHH PCP, LLC et al
|
02/24/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01033 - Cardiovascular Care Group, Inc. v. EClinicalworks,LLC
|
05/03/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01034 - Weems v. Change Healthcare Holdings,Inc.
|
05/03/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01048 - LMCHH PCP LLC et al v. Delaney et al
|
08/10/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:17-ap-01069 - LMCHH PCP LLC et al v. First Financial Corporate Leasing, LLC d/b/a First
|
10/31/2017
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01016 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Amedisys Specialized Medical Services, L.L.C.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01015 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Erato, M.D.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01017 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Peterson
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01018 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Presidio Networked Solutions LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01019 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Psmomas, M.D.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01020 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. The Spectranetics Corporation
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01021 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Zimmer, Inc.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01022 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Eclinical Works, LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01023 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. John M. Langley, M.D. a Professional Medical Corpo
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01024 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Crescent Imaging, LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01014 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. St. Jude Medical, a Division of Abbott Laboratorie
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01005 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. 3M Company
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01006 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Aesculap Implant Systems, LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01007 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Aramark Healthcare Technologies, LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01008 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Cleco Corporate Holdings LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01009 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. DSA Perfusion, L.L.C.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01010 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Walter Gipson, M.D.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01011 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Henry Schein, Inc.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01012 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Pharmedium Services, LLC
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01013 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Philips Healthcare - Koninklijke Philips N.V.
|
01/28/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01037 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Bruce Kerry, M.D.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01036 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01035 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Alphatec Spine, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01028 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Abbott Vascular
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01034 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01033 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Westport Linen Services, L.L.C.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01032 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Uptodate, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01030 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. 4Web, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01029 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Image Works, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01027 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Carefusion Solutions, LLC
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01026 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. MBA Medical, Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01025 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. The Finger, Fong and Gosey Group Practice, L.L.C.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01031 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.
|
01/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01058 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Tammany Utilities
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01057 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinn
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01056 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. a/k/a Smith & Nephew Orthopae
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01055 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Charter Communications, LLC
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01054 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Medical Transcription Associates, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01053 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Star Service, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01052 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Scimage, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01051 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Rupp Marketing
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01050 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA)
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01049 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Precision Spine Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01048 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01047 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Olympus America, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01046 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Multitech Office Machines, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01045 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Wilbon
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01044 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. K2M, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01043 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Harold R. Neitzschman, III, M.D. (A Professional M
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01042 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Diagnostica Stago Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01041 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01040 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Baxter Healthcare Corporation
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01039 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Appriver, LLC
|
01/30/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-01038 - LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medica
|
01/30/2019
|