Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Glen E Conrad
Case #: 3:17-cv-00011
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2017

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 06/22/2017 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 15, 2017
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan Mon 4:36 PM
Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff Betsy Ackerson(Carter, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 04, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 2/20-2/23/2018 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 5:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 1/11/2018 Jury Trial set for 2/20-2/23/2018 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. . Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/4/2017. (ssm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 misc Scheduling Letter Fri 11:28 AM
Scheduling Letter (ssm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
5 5 notice Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties Fri 4:03 PM
Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia.(Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Wed 5:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Waiver of Service, Complaint, Summons served on Stephanie Karn, Counsel for Defendants on 02/15/2017, filed by Betsy Ackerson.(Carter, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Waiver of Service Form
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 12:04 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT for monetary and equitable relief against The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; receipt 0423-261-8752.), filed by Betsy Ackerson. 70 Day Notice due by 4/26/2017 90 Day Service due by 5/16/2017(mab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet