Osburn v. Parker et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Webber Wright |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00094 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 03/14 8:36 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (mef) |
|
6 | 6
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 03/13 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT entered that this case be dismissed without prejudice 5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/13/2017. (lej) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 03/13 2:59 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss his complaint4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/13/2017. (lej) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/13 2:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Morton Osburn, Jr. (mef) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/22 10:06 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit1 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint", and file within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/22/2017. (lej) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/15 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Morton Osburn, Jr.(kdr) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/15 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Morton Osburn, Jr. (kdr) |