Derx v. Kelley et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00040 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Defendant
Albert Kittrell
|
|
Defendant
Jeremy Andrews
|
|
Defendant
Roderick Davis
|
|
Defendant
Wendy Kelley
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis R Derx
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Mon 05/10 2:31 PM
Docket Note: Filing fee paid in full on this date. (ajt) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Wed 07/05 4:49 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (mcz) |
|
25 | 25
order
Judgment 1983
Wed 07/05 4:45 PM
JUDGMENT Consistent with the24 Order that was entered this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Dismissal of this action constitutes a strike for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/5/2017. (mcz) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/05 4:42 PM
ORDER Adopting22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety. The Clerk will amend the docket to reflect the full and correct names of Defendants Roderick Davis, Albert Kittrell, and Jeremy Andrews. Defendants Davis and Kittrell's16 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Defendants Kelley and Andrews's20 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action counts as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/5/2017. (mcz) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Order
Thu 06/22 2:03 PM
MOTION for Order by Dennis R Derx. (ljb) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 06/19 12:52 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect the full and correct names of Defendants Davis, Kittrell, and Andrews. Defendants Davis, Kittrell, Kelley and Andrews's motions to dismiss be granted16 20 . Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/19/2017. (lej) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
brief
Brief in Support
Fri 06/02 5:23 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Andrwes, Wendy Kelley. (Hudson, Renae) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 06/02 5:06 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Andrwes, Wendy Kelley (Hudson, Renae) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kittrell served on 4/25/2017. (fjg) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Davis Roderick served on 4/25/2017. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
brief
Brief in Support
Wed 05/10 3:18 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kittrell, Davis Roderick. (Eubanks, Brent) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/10 3:16 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kittrell, Davis Roderick (Eubanks, Brent) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Consent Notice
Mon 05/01 8:18 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 04/28 5:00 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrwes, Wendy Kelley.(Hudson, Renae) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/28 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Renae Ford Hudson on behalf of Andrwes, Wendy Kelley (Hudson, Renae) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/26 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Kittrell, Davis Roderick (Eubanks, Brent) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 04/17 12:53 PM
ORDER directing that the Clerk of the Court shall reissue summons for Defendants Davis Roderick and Kittrell, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the4 Amended Complaint, Summons and this Order on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Service should be through Humphries, Odum & Eubanks, Post Office Box 20670, White Hall, Arkansas 71612. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/17/2017. (mcz) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 2:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Kittrell, Davis Roderick. Forwarded to U. S. Marshal for service. (mcz) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/14 8:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Andrwes served on 4/10/2017. (scw) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/14 8:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wendy Kelley served on 4/10/2017. (scw) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 04/13 3:08 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kittrell. (scw) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 04/13 3:07 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Davis Roderick. (scw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 03/21 4:01 PM
ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/21/2017. (lej) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lej) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 03/20 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Dennis R Derx. (thd) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Dennis R Derx.(mef) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/21 3:29 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit1 . The Clerk shall amend the docket to correct the spelling of Defendant Wendy Kelley's name. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/21/2017. (lej) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/15 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis R Derx.(kdr) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/15 3:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis R Derx. (kdr) |