Southwest Airlines Co v. Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Referred: | Rebecca Rutherford |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00431 |
Nature of Suit | 740 Labor - Railway Labor Act |
Cause | 45:151 Railway Labor Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 5:10 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Gene Painter
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Bret Oestreich
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Michael Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Craig Hamlet
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Shane Flachman
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Robert Cramer
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Earl Clark
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, Local 11
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Michael Young
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Southwest Airlines Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Young
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gene Painter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bret Oestreich
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Craig Hamlet
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shane Flachman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Cramer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Earl Clark
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, Local 11
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southwest Airlines Co
|
Represented By
|
1. | Southwest Airlines files federal lawsuit accusing mechanics of boycotting overtime shifts (dallasnews.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/17/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
127 | 127
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/23 1:57 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Southwest Airlines Co. (Correll, Michael) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 09/24 10:10 AM
Civil Case Terminated per127 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ykp) |