Roberts-Harris v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00150 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Roberts-Harris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Thu 03/02 10:37 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: Having considered the Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court makes and delivers the following ruling: It is ORDERED that all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted herein are dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all costs and attorney's fees are to be borne by the party incurring same. All relief not expressly granted is hereby denied, such that this constitutes final judgment herein. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/2/2017) (mpw) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/01 1:20 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Patricia Roberts-Harris. (tln) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 02/22 10:26 AM
Appendix in Support filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re6 MOTION to Dismiss. (tln) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 02/22 10:26 AM
Brief in Support filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re6 MOTION to Dismiss. (tln) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/22 10:25 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (tln) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 11:12 AM
Judge McBryde's paper original and copy pursuant to the standing order of1 Notice of Removal,2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (tln) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Wed 02/15 3:44 PM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 2/15/2017) (tln) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
McBryde
Wed 02/15 3:44 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/15 3:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Yow, R) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/15 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 48th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, case number 048-290312-17 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8213022) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lewis, Wm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |