Rusk v. Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00007 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Rusk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 10/31 3:11 PM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The above-styled and -numbered civil action is Dismissed with Prejudice with costs taxed against the party incurring same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/31/2017) (dsr) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/26 3:55 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.. (Cox, Tiffany) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/21 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 7/14/2017. Motions in Limine and Discovery must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on 8/13/2018. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 3/15/2018. Jury Trial set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 216, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, TX 76903-6451 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/21/2017) (dsr) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.. (Cox, Tiffany) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/15 4:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tiffany Lee Cox added to party Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (Cox, Tiffany) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/15 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc. (dsr) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Cummings (West Texas)
Wed 02/15 4:00 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/15 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Rusk. (Wheeler, Kalandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/15 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Buffalo Gap Instrumentation and Electrical Co., Inc. filed by Mary Rusk. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8212334) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wheeler, Kalandra) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |