U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kevin Sc Chang |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00067 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2017 11:52 PM HST |
Defendant
Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-5, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room 7-127
Honolulu, HI 96850 |
Represented By
|
1. | Federal government files lawsuit against Hawaii tour company, alleges president sexually harassed male employees (staradvertiser.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/16/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment - Consent
Wed 05/30 6:59 AM
CONSENT DECREE; ORDER - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/29/2018. (emt, ) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Link
Fri 05/11 4:42 PM
EO: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request to extend the deadline to submit closing documents from 5/14/18 to 5/29/18 and the deadline to file amended pleadings from 6/20/18 to 7/5/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
minutes
Link
Tue 04/24 11:58 AM
EO: Pursuant to Mr. Mackey's request, the deadline for filing closing documents is extended to 5/14/18. In addition, the deadline to file motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings is extended to 6/20/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Link
Tue 03/27 8:29 AM
EO: Pursuant to Mr. Mackey's request, the deadline for filing closing documents is extended to 4/30/18. In addition, the deadline to file motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings is extended to 6/6/18.. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Link
Tue 02/20 2:13 PM
EO: Pursuant to Eric Yau's request, by agreement of the parties, the deadline for filing closing documents is extended to 3/29/18. In addition, the deadline to file motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings is extended to 5/7/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
1 - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R) Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/22 10:00 PM
EO: On 1/22/18, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Stay and Extension With Request for Expedited Ruling32 , seeking a stay of the litigation for the duration of the government shutdown and for a corresponding extension of all deadlines. Insofar as the shutdown has ended, this Motion is moot and is accordingly DENIED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Stay
Mon 01/22 10:19 AM
MOTION to Stay Case Eric Yau appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Link
Fri 01/19 7:34 AM
EO: Pursuant to Eric Yau's request, by agreement of the parties, the deadline for filing closing documents is extended to 2/22/18. In addition, the deadline to file motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings is extended to 4/2/18. re29 Set Deadlines/Hearings, Status Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/27 3:25 PM
AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 10/27/2017. (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
2 - Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Conference
Fri 10/27 11:13 AM
EP: Status Conference by Telephone - Ms. Petrus informed the Court that the parties have been in active settlement discussions with Mediator Susan Ichinose, and have reached an agreement as to the dollar amount. However, the EEOC is seeking affirmative relief, and individual settlement agreements with each of the claimants will require additional time. Parties are requesting that the deadlines be moved in order to finalize the settlement agreement. Discussion held. Court will continue the Jury Trial 6 months from 9/10/18 to 3/18/19 @ 9:00 a.m. DKW. Filing of an amended complaint set for 11/3/17 is continued 120 days to 3/5/18. Filing of closing documents are due in 90 days by 1/25/18. New dates issued: 1.Jury trial on March 18, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. before DKW 2.Final Pretrial Conference on February 5, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3.Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4.Final Pretrial Statement by January 29, 2019 5.File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 5, 2018 6.File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 19, 2018 7.File Dispositive Motions by October 17, 2018 8a.File Motions in Limine by February 26, 2019 8b.File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 5, 2019 11a.Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures by September 17, 2018 11b.Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures by October 17, 2018 12.Discovery deadline January 18, 2019 13.Settlement Conference set for November 28, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before KSC 14.Settlement Conference statements by November 21, 2018 20.Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by March 5, 2019 21.File Final witness list by February 26, 2019 24.Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 19, 2019 25.Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 26, 2019 26.The parties are not required to file a statement of objections to exhibits 28a.File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 26, 2019 28b.File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 5, 2019 29.File Trial Brief by March 5, 2019 30.File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: Status Conference held on 10/27/2017. Discovery due by 1/18/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/17/2018. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 3/18/2019 in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 11/28/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Thu 10/26 1:47 PM
EO: A Status Conference by Telephone is set for 10/27/2017 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Parties are direct to call Toni Fujinaga at 541-1297 to provide a telephone number where they may be reached. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
35
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 09/21 4:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re9 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/21/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The EEOC is granted leave to file an amended complaint to attempt to cure the deficiencies noted in this Order by November 3, 2017 ." (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 09/13 11:48 AM
EP: Hearing held on9 Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc. and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed on February 15, 2017. Oral arguments heard. Motion taken under Advisement. Court to issue a written order. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply
Wed 08/30 2:57 PM
REPLY re9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc.; and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed on February 15, 2017 ; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service filed by Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc..(Petrus, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Compliance, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/23 4:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. d/b/a Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Docket #9) filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Eric Yau, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge of Discrimination_dtd 2015.11.05, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - 2016 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2016.07.01, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - 2015 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2015.10.01, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Articles of Incorporation - Big Kahuna Luau, Inc_2015.10.20, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Articles of Incorporation - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2008.11.05, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 2009 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2010.01.05, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - 2010 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2010.10.06, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - 2011 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2011.10.05, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - 2012 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2012.10.18, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 -2003 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2003.09.30, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 -2004 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2004.09.01, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 -2005 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours_2005.11.08, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - 2006 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2007.02.08, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - 2007 Annual Report - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2007.09.06., | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - Officer Change Form - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc. 2012.12.31, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - 2013 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2014.05.26, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - 2014 Annual Report - Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc_2015.04.06, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Assignment of Trade Name - Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc_2015.01.28, | ||
Att: 20 Certification of Compliance Pursuant to LR 7.5(e), | ||
Att: 21 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Wed 08/09 8:48 AM
EO: By agreement of the parties,9 Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed On 2/15/2017 set for 9/1/2017 is continued to 9/13/2017 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge Derrick K. Watson. The briefing schedule for this motion is governed by the Local Rules, based on the new hearing date of 9/13/2017. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Wed 05/03 7:35 AM
EO: By agreement of the parties,9 Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed On 2/15/2017 set for 8/4/2017 is continued to 9/1/2017 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge Derrick K. Watson. The briefing schedule for this motion is governed by the Local Rules, based on the new hearing date of 9/1/2017. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Tue 05/02 10:27 AM
EO: At the request of Barbara A. Petrus and agreement by opposing counsel, the hearing on9 Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed On 2/15/2017 set for 5/26/2017 is continued to 8/4/2017 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge Derrick K. Watson. The briefing schedule for this motion is governed by the Local Rules, based on the new hearing date of 8/4/2017. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 9:12 AM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 4/26/2017. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Tue 04/25 2:12 PM
EP:Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2017. Plaintiffs Counsel Rumduol Vuong participated telephonically. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order will be issued and filed. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 9/10/2018 in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 6/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/11/2018. Discovery Deadline 7/13/2018. (Court Reporter None.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, ) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report of Planning Meeting
Mon 04/24 7:05 AM
REPORT of Planning Meeting AND [PROPOSED] DISCOVERY PLAN PURSUANT TO FRCP 26 (f) AND LR 26.1 . (Yau, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 04/21 9:01 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service .(Petrus, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
16 | 16
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 04/21 4:21 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement PURSUANT TO LR 16.2 (b) .(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
2 - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 04/19 10:25 AM
EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2017 is hereby moved to 10:15AM on 4/25/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. If Counsel want to participate telephonically at this court hearing notify Leslie Sai, Courtroom Manager (808) 541-3089 with a telephone number that they may be called at. Please-Note-Judge Chang will be attending the District Conference on 4/28/2017 and is on unavailable status on 4/28/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/12 8:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc.. (Petrus, Barbara) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
2 - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 04/11 7:11 AM
EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2017 is hereby continued to 4/28/2017 at 10:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Counsel may participate telephonically at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Counsel are to notify Leslie Sai, Courtroom Manager at 541-3089 a telephone number that they may be reached at to participate telephonically. This is the date and time slot that Judge Chang is available. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(lls, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/10 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Mackey on behalf of Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc. on behalf of Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc.. (Mackey, John) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Redacted Document
Mon 04/10 12:11 PM
REDACTION to9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc.; and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed on February 15, 2017 REDACTED EXHIBIT A by Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc.. (Petrus, Barbara) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 04/10 8:09 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on9 Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc., and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed On 2/15/2017 set for 5/26/2017 @ 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
misc
Advisory Entry
Mon 04/10 10:11 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that an exhibit submitted in support of docket number9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc., Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. contains personal identifiers. The filing party may refer to LR100.10.1 Personal Identifiers, LR100.10.2. Redaction/Reference List and LR100.10.3. Responsibility of Counsel. The filing party may submit a redacted version of the exhibit. For e-filing purposes , please select the filing event "redacted document" from the "Other Documents" filing category and when prompted by the filing system, "link" the document to the Motion to Dismiss. The submission of the redacted exhibit should include a caption cover page, to include the case number, counsel identification and document caption. Upon the filing of the redacted exhibit, the Clerk's Office will restrict viewing of the affected exhibit contained in the Motion to Dismiss. (emt, ) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/07 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. dba Discover Hawaii Tours, Hawaii Tours and Transportation Inc.; and Big Kahuna Luau, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed on February 15, 2017 Barbara A. Petrus appearing for Defendants Big Kahuna Luau, Inc., Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc., Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc.(Petrus, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Barbara A. Petrus, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/02 3:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Big Kahuna Luau, Inc. waiver sent on 2/24/2017, answer due 4/25/2017.(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/02 3:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 2/24/2017, answer due 4/25/2017.(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/02 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc. waiver sent on 2/24/2017, answer due 4/25/2017.(Yau, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 02/15 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 17-00067 DKW-KSC on all filngs . (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/15 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours, Inc.. (eps, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons as to Hawaii Tours and Transportation, Inc. (issued), | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to Big Kahuna Luau, Inc. (issued) | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Wed 02/15 10:52 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (eps, ) |
|
Att: 1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, | ||
Att: 2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Wed 02/15 10:51 AM
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 4/17/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 02/15/2017. (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT) |
|
Att: 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/15 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Park, Anna) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Re Big Kahuna Luau, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Re Discovering Hidden Hawaii Tours dba Discover Hawaii Tours, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Re Hawaii Tours and Transportation |