|
GPO
May 16 2017
lure to state a claim. Further, Judge McGowan enjoys absolute immunity for actions taken in her role as a judge. Jennings's claim against her is therefore dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The Court returns this case to theORDER: Jennings hasn't submitted an amended complaint with specifics about his inadequate medical care claim against Barbee, Huff, Bangs, and Sanders; and the time to do so has passed. That claim is therefore dismissed without prejudice for fai Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on Jennings's excessive force claim against Bangs and Sanders. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2017. (jak)
|
|
GPO
Mar 13 2018
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, and 1 Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/13/2018. (lmc)
|
|
GPO
Apr 02 2018
ORDER Adopting 30 Report and Recommendations. 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, granted. Jennings's remaining claims will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/2/2018. (mcz)
|
|
GPO
Apr 02 2018
JUDGMENT: Jennings's claims against Judge McGowan are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/2/2018. (jak)
|