Monroe v. Brusseux et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Leon Holmes |
Referred: | Beth Deere |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
Arkansas State Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Brusseux
|
|
Defendant
Sam House
|
|
Defendant
Wall
|
|
Defendant
Arkansas, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Seth Monroe, Jr
305 South Palm Street Unit A
Little Rock, AR 72205 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Wed 08/09 2:50 PM
JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2017. (kdr) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/09 2:47 PM
ORDER approving and adopting as this Court's findings in all respects8 the Recommended Disposition; and dismissing without prejudice2 Mr. Monroe's complaint,6 amended complaint; and7 amended complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2017. (kdr) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/26 2:41 PM
RESPONSE RE8 Jr (jap) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/19 4:18 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Judge Holmes dismiss Mr. Monroe's2 complaint,6 first amended complaint, and7 second amended complaint. Objections due within 14 days of filing of the Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/19/2017. (kdr) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/28 2:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Seth Monroe, Jr. (adding Defendant State of Arkansas)(kdr) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/14 1:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Seth Monroe, Jr.(mef) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 1:27 PM
NOTICE to the Court filed by Seth Monroe, Jr. (mef) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/27 2:48 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and providing Mr. Monroe 30 days to file an amended complaint to address the defects in his complaint. Failure to comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of his lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/27/2017. (mef) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/21 10:41 AM
ORDER referring this action to United States Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/2017. (ljb) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/16 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Seth Monroe, Jr.(mef) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/16 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Seth Monroe, Jr. (mef) |