Sochin v. Complete Payment Recovery Solutions
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00365 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions on use of telephone equipment |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Complete Payment Recovery Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wyatt Sochin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 05/03 3:17 PM
Case closed per filing of11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wyatt Sochin. No order to enter. (hb) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/28 9:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wyatt Sochin. (Lafferty, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/28 2:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Complete Payment Recovery Solutions. (Al-Nimri, Elaina) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 03/28 2:31 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Complete Payment Recovery Solutions.(Al-Nimri, Elaina) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Complete Payment Recovery Solutions, filed by Wyatt Sochin.(Lafferty, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 03/21 9:01 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Elaina S. Al-Nimri. (hb) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elaina S. Al-Nimri on behalf of Complete Payment Recovery Solutions (Al-Nimri, Elaina) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/09 12:25 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Michael Lupolover) by Wyatt Sochin. (Lafferty, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/28 2:01 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for July 6, 2017 is RESET for Thursday, June 15, 2017 at 1:15 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 28th day of February 2017. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/28/17. (af) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 02/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (hb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 02/16 3:13 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (hb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 02/16 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (hb) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 02/16 3:22 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Susan S. Lafferty, NJ State Bar status verified as active for Michael Lupolover. (hb) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Thu 02/16 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Lupolover: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 3/9/2017. (hb) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/16 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Complete Payment Recovery Solutions (Filing fee PAID $400, Receipt number 0650-2382731), filed by Wyatt Sochin.(Service copies to be mailed back to counsel.)(hb) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons |