Seneca Insurance Company Inc v. Stabbert
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00442 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 4:23 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Rano Stabbert
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Seneca Insurance Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rano Stabbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seneca Insurance Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 11/28 11:29 AM
AGREED STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/28/2017) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/20 6:16 PM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AGREED STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/02 3:45 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING APPRAISAL filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Status Report Order
Fri 08/25 3:49 PM
ORDER: Parties shall file an additional joint status report regarding appraisal no later than 9/29/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/25/2017) (epm) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/24 6:35 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING APPRAISAL filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Status Report Order
Fri 07/28 5:08 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file an additional joint status report regarding appraisal no later than by 8/25/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/28/2017) (axm) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/27 7:12 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING APPRAISAL filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Tue 05/23 4:37 PM
ORDER: The plaintiff's motion to compel appraisal and abate litigation17 is GRANTED. This action is STAYED until the appraisal process is completed. Status update on the appraisal process due 7/24/17. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/23/2017) (ash) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 04/05 3:49 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc re17 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation ,18 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation (Avery, Christopher) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 04/05 3:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc re17 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation (Avery, Christopher) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Compel
Wed 04/05 3:45 PM
MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/03 4:23 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for Court's four-week docket beginning 5/7/2018 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 7/3/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2017. Motions due by 11/24/2017. Discovery due by 1/31/2018. Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/27/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2018 10:00 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/3/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 03/31 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. Related document:6 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/31 11:04 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Avery, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/16 10:25 AM
ORDER: Defendant's (sic) unopposed motion to withdraw counsel (docket entry12 ) is GRANTED. Therefore, attorney Lauren E. Figaro is WITHDRAWN as attorney for plaintiff. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/16/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 03/13 5:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc (Isbell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 03/13 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Zachary Moseley for Jacob VonPlonski on behalf of Rano Stabbert. (Moseley, John) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/13 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Plaintiff filed by Rano Stabbert (Moseley, John) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 03/10 4:47 PM
ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will subject the defendant to the entry of default judgment without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/10/2017) (chmb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/10 4:44 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2017. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/10/2017) (chmb) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 4:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rano Stabbert. (Moseley, John) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 03/10 4:16 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Rano Stabbert. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Seneca Insurance Company Inc filed by Rano StabbertAttorney John Zachary Moseley added to party Rano Stabbert(pty:dft) (Moseley, John) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. (Isbell, James) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/17 2:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Rano Stabbert filed by Seneca Insurance Company Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Isbell, James) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Supplemental Document
Thu 02/16 4:54 PM
Supplemental Document by Seneca Insurance Company Inc as to1 Complaint,,,, Civil Cover Sheet . (Isbell, James) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Fish
Thu 02/16 3:52 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/16 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Rano Stabbert filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8215575) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Isbell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A |