Dennis v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00443 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Wed 03/14 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT: The decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/13/2018) (epm) |
|
26 | 26
30+
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Wed 03/14 9:00 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/13/2018) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Appellees Brief
Wed 09/20 9:57 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by Nancy A Berryhill. (Mullins Pryor, Dianne) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Appellants Brief
Mon 08/21 9:06 AM
Appellant's BRIEF by Tajuana Dennis. |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 08/21 8:54 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/21/2017) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez) |
|
Sunday, August 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File
Sun 08/20 8:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Appeal Brief filed by Tajuana Dennis with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appeal Brief | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 06/29 8:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file the plaintiff's brief. The plaintiff's brief is due by 7/24/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/29/2017) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 06/28 4:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief filed by Tajuana Dennis (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 05/10 2:09 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff's brief is due by 6/24/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/10/2017) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 05/10 12:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to file Plaintiff's Brief filed by Tajuana Dennis (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/25 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Claimant shall file a brief setting forth all errors that he/she contends entitle him/her to relief by 5/25/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/25/2017) (mcrd) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case
Mon 04/24 2:29 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish and Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/24/2017) (epm) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 04/24 12:15 PM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Mullins Pryor, Dianne) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s) | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/24 12:09 PM
Notice of parties' consents to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Tajuana Dennis, Nancy A Berryhill. (ctf) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/24 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Mullins Pryor, Dianne) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/24 11:56 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Dianne Marie Mullins Pryor added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Mullins Pryor, Dianne) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned
Wed 03/22 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill per the NDTX US Attorney ; served on 2/23/2017. (svc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned
Wed 03/22 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General. (svc) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Wed 03/22 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill ; served on 2/27/2017. (svc) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Business Reply Card Signed
Fri 02/17 1:15 PM
Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re1 Complaint,5 New Case Notes,6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,7 Summons Issued. Signed on 2/17/2017. (sss) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/17 12:13 PM
Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sss) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS MOTION AND ORDERING SERVICE OF PROCESS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/17/2017) (sss) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
qcref
Fish
Thu 02/16 3:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/16 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tajuana Dennis. (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 02/16 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cheryl Chapman Langston on behalf of Tajuana Dennis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/16 1:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tajuana Dennis (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/16 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill filed by Tajuana Dennis. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Langston, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |