Garza v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00445 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Amulfo Salome Garza
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Thu 01/25 3:08 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/25/2018) (ykp) |
|
21 | 21
9
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 01/25 3:05 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. 17, is DENIED, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. 18, is GRANTED, and the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/25/2018) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/06 1:02 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/6/2017) (twd) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/06 9:59 AM
Notice of parties' consents to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Amulfo Salome Garza, Nancy A Berryhill. (ctf) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/03 2:22 PM
RESPONSE filed by Nancy A Berryhill re:17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Cain, Simone) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 06/02 7:25 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amulfo Salome Garza with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nel, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support of MSJ, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order and Judgment | ||
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent
Mon 05/08 8:30 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. If appropriate, parties should return the signed consent form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/6/2017) (mcrd) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/08 8:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 6/7/2017. Defendant shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment within 30 days after the filing of Plaintiff's summary judgment motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/6/2017) (mcrd) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 05/01 9:18 AM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Cain, Simone) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s) | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/01 9:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Cain, Simone) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/01 9:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Simone Pereira Cain added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Cain, Simone) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned
Mon 03/13 4:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General ; served on 3/3/2017. (ndt) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned
Mon 03/13 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney ; served on 2/28/2017. (ndt) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Mon 03/13 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill ; served on 2/27/2017. (ndt) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Business Reply Card Signed
Tue 02/21 8:42 AM
Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,1 Complaint,7 Summons. Signed on 2/17/2017. (ykp) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/17 9:36 AM
Summons issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 8:35 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint in the case to the U.S. Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/17/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
qcref
Boyle
Thu 02/16 3:20 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (ykp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/16 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amulfo Salome Garza. (Nel, Jacqueline) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 02/16 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline F Nel on behalf of Amulfo Salome Garza. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nel, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/16 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amulfo Salome Garza (Nel, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/16 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Amulfo Salome Garza. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Nel, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |