Star Fabrics Inc v. Zinga Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01277 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Frenzi
|
|
Defendant
Zinga Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Ye-Eun, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Star Fabrics Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lady Bug
Terminated: 07/06/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Fri 12/08 11:16 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge
Fri 12/08 11:13 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT by Judge George H. Wu. THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: A Judgment in the amount of Thirty Two Thousand Eight Hundred and Fifty Nine Dollars and Seven Cents ($32,859.07) is hereby GRANTED and ENTERED against ZINGA, INC., a California Corporation, and in favor of STAR FABRICS, INC., along with interest in the amount prescribed by statute. Related to: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant ZINGA, INC.28 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lom) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 12/07 11:29 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The case is called. Counsel makes his appearances. There is no appearance by the defendant. The Court and counsel confer. The Court's TENTATIVE Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. The Court makes the Tentative its FINAL Ruling. For reasons stated on the record, the plaintiff is ordered to file an Amended Judgment by today's date. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 11/29 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant ZINGA, INC.28(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Haroni, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Haroni, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Haroni | ||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 11/27 6:18 PM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant ZINGA, INC. filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Haroni, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Haroni, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Haroni, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/15 10:39 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re Plaintiff's motion for default judgment as to Defendant Zinga19 . The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. Plaintiff will have until November 27, 2017 to file an amended application. The Court continues the status conference to December 4, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 11/07 10:05 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Court confers with Plaintiff's counsel. Dismissals as to Defendants Frenzi and Ye-Eun, Inc. will be filed forthwith. The Court continues the status conference to November 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court will review Plaintiffs motion for default judgment as to Defendant Zinga19 and a ruling will issue on November 13. Counsel may appear telephonically provided advanced notice is given to the clerk. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Mon 11/06 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Frenzi, Ye-Eun, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Amended Minutes
Fri 11/03 4:30 PM
AMENDED MINUTES ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ZINGA, INC. BY COURT19 ; PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT FRENZI BY COURT20 held before Judge George H. Wu re: Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Motion Hearing,23 . Plaintiff's applications for default judgment are DENIED and the entry of default entered against Defendant Frenzi is SET ASIDE. (mrgo) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Motion Hearing Default Judgment ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 09/26 1:45 PM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ZINGA, INC. BY COURT19 ; PLAINTIFF;S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT FRENZI BY COURT20 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiff's applications for default judgment are GRANTED and the entry of default entered against Defendant Frenzi is SET ASIDE. The Court sets a status conference for November 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
Sunday, September 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Sun 09/03 11:33 AM
DECLARATION of of Adir Haroni in Support APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Zinga, Inc.19 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Sun 09/03 11:32 AM
DECLARATION of of Adir Haroni in Support APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Frenzi20 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 08/29 7:41 PM
APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Frenzi filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. Application set for hearing on 9/25/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 08/29 7:40 PM
APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Zinga, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. Application set for hearing on 9/25/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/15 11:13 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than August 29, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Fri 07/07 10:19 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Zinga Inc, Frenzi, a Business Entity of Form Unknown. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Thu 07/06 2:25 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Zinga Inc filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Thu 07/06 2:24 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Frenzi filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 07/06 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Lady Bug. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/23 3:02 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/7/2017. (kss) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 4:40 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 5:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc, upon Defendant Zinga Inc served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael C Park, Agent c/o Jenny Choi, Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 5:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc, upon Defendant Frenzi served on 3/18/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Kim, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 02/22 11:49 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 02/17 9:57 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants Frenzi, Lady Bug, Ye-Eun, Inc., Zinga Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 02/17 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 02/17 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 02/16 5:49 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Star Fabrics Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 02/16 3:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 02/16 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 02/16 3:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/16 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19378659 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Star Fabrics Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |