Naomi Crocker v. Life Insurance Company of North America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01291 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 2:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Naomi Crocker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 06/12 4:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Based upon the stipulation of the parties15 and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, Case No. 2:17-cv-01291 CAS (AJWx), is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. (iv) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 06/09 1:34 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Vana, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/27 4:00 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER REMOVING ACTION FROM THE ACTIVE LIST OF CASES, PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: THE COURT, having been notified by counsel that the action has been settled on or about 4/25/201713 ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from this Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 60 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Tue 04/25 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Naomi Crocker. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/13 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Naomi Crocker; Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"); Connecticut General Corporation; Cigna Holdings, Inc.; and Cigna Corporation. (Vana, Allison) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/13 5:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 2:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 03/03 4:26 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 4/14/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Allison Anne Vana added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Vana, Allison) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 02/24 2:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Naomi Crocker, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 2/23/2017, answer due 3/16/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys L. Aguilera of CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 02/17 5:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 02/17 4:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 02/17 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 02/16 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Naomi Crocker. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 02/16 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Naomi Crocker. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 02/16 4:58 PM
Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Naomi Crocker, (Bather, Phillip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/16 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19379957 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Naomi Crocker. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Naomi Crocker(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint |