Integrity Skilled Care, Inc.
Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James W Boyd |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00677 |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Debtor
Integrity Skilled Care, Inc.
2062 North US 31 South-Ste A
Traverse City, MI 49685 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Kelly M. Hagan
Hagan Law Offices, PLC P.O. Box 6844 www.trusteehagan.com
Traverse City, MI 49686 |
Docket last updated: 02/17/2017 12:02 PM EST |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/17 10:28 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-00677 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 12890610, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) auto
Fri 02/17 10:24 AM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Integrity Skilled Care, Inc. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/20/2017 (Bare, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Atty. for Debtor - BR 2016 Statement
Fri 02/17 10:25 AM
BR 2016 Disclosure of Compensation for Paul I. Bare, Debtor's Attorney, Fees: $1500; Awarded on 2/17/2017 Filed by Debtor Integrity Skilled Care, Inc. (Bare, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Fri 02/17 10:36 AM
Affidavit In Support of Assertion that an Ombudsman Under 11 USC Section 333 is not Necessary Filed by Debtor Integrity Skilled Care, Inc. (Bare, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Asset Protection Report
Fri 02/17 11:04 AM
Corrected Asset Protection Report Filed by Debtor Integrity Skilled Care, Inc. (Bare, Paul) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 02/17 12:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/04/2017 at 11:00 AM at Traverse City. (admin, ) |