McBattas Packaging & Printing, Inc
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Shon Hastings |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40203 |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Debtor
McBattas Packaging & Printing, Inc
PO Box 262
Fairbury, NE 68352-0262 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Rick D. Lange
Chapter 7 Trustee 3 Landmark Centre 1128 Lincoln Mall, Ste. 300
Lincoln, NE 68508 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Docket last updated: 02/17/2017 3:47 PM CST |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - Case Upload
Fri 02/17 1:49 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount filed by David P. Lepant of Lepant Law Office, PC, LLO on behalf of McBattas Packaging & Printing, Inc. (Lepant, David) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 02/17 1:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - Case Upload 17-40203 [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 7079836, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Non-Compliance Corporation
Fri 02/17 3:31 PM
Notice of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 1002-1 . Show Cause due by 3/3/2017. (jea) |
|
4 | 4
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7
Fri 02/17 1:51 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Rick D. Lange, with 341(a) |