Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-04707 |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC
1585 Ellingwood Avenue, Suite 100
Des Plaines, IL 60016 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
300 | 300
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 03/25 3:55 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Camacho, Marilyn) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2019 | ||
299 | 299
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Sun 03/24 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal . No. of Notices: 110. Notice Date 03/24/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2019 | ||
298 | 298
crditcrd
none
Sat 03/23 11:25 AM
Receipt of List of Creditors/Matrix 17-04707 [misc,listcred] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39360625. Fee Amount $ 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
297 | 297
misc
List of Creditors/Matrix
Fri 03/22 11:13 AM
Amended List of Creditors,Mailing Matrix, Fee Amount $31 Filed by Xiaoming Wu on behalf of Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC. (Wu, Xiaoming) |
|
296 | 296
order
Generic Order
Fri 03/22 10:39 AM
Order Denying as Moot . Signed on 3/22/2019 (Green, Ron) |
|
295 | 295
order
Generic Order
Fri 03/22 10:35 AM
Order - that pursuant to this court's Order sustaining creditor's objection and dismissing this case, the objection raised by the creditors Tatyana Filek and Aleksandra on March 6, 2019 is Sustained. This case is hereby Dismissed . Signed on 3/22/2019 (Green, Ron) |
|
294 | 294
order
Dismissing Bankruptcy
Fri 03/22 10:29 AM
Order Sustaining Creditor's Objection and Dismissing Debtor . Signed on 3/22/2019 (Green, Ron) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
293 | 293
misc
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements
Thu 03/21 10:05 PM
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for Filing Period Ending 2 28-2019 Filed by Xiaoming Wu on behalf of Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC. (Wu, Xiaoming) |