Cimino Restaurants LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Cynthia C Jackson |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-01012 |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Debtor
Cimino Restaurants LLC
126 W Plant St
Winter Garden, FL 34787-3143 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL7/13
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 02/18/2017 12:04 AM EST |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/17 3:34 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:17-bk-01012) [misc,volp7a2] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 52731924, Amount Paid $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 02/17 3:32 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Not Filed Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed . Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed or Not Required . Filed by John Andrew Braithwaite on behalf of Cimino Restaurants LLC. (Braithwaite, John) |