WEBSTER v. LLR, INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | David S Cercone |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
LLR, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ARTHUR H. STROYD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RACHAEL WEBSTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMANDA CLOSE
|
|
Plaintiff
SARA GATES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELISSA HILL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HOLLY LEDERER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAUREEN MCGUINNESS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONNA NEWMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAUREN PORSCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE PROKOP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORRAINE SNODGRASS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALISON WHITEHEAD
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against LuLaRoe over sales tax charges (snopes.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/11/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
118 | 118
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/12 2:52 PM
ORDER denying113 Bill of Costs filed by LLR, INC. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/12/19. (jmc) |