Ellis v. Social Security Administration
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joe J Volpe |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00026 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
misc
Case File Note
Wed 07/13 4:47 PM
CASE FILE NOTE:10 Administrative Transcript maintained as a material record and sent to the National Records Center (Accession 021 22-0128 Box 23). The remainder of the file is maintained as an electronic record. (ade) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Mon 07/10 3:38 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Social Security Administration against Dee Dee Ellis14 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/10/2017. (lej) |
|
14 | 14
5
pgs
order
Memorandum Order
Mon 07/10 3:34 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the final decision of the Commissioner is affirmed and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/10/2017. (lej) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Defendant's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 07/07 2:12 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (Clark, Jonathan) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Clark on behalf of Social Security Administration (Clark, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 06/09 12:10 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Dee Dee Ellis. Defendant Brief due by 7/21/2017 (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Administrative Transcript
Mon 05/01 4:50 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re7 Answer to Complaint and8 Notice (Other). Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (scw) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/27 10:30 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 6/8/2017. Defendant must file a brief within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/27/2017. (lej) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/27 9:22 AM
NOTICE by Social Security Administration re7 Answer to Complaint Notice of Conventional Filing of the Administrative Transcript (Bono, Gabriel) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/27 9:18 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Bono, Gabriel) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/21 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Michael Bono on behalf of Social Security Administration (Bono, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/21 8:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dee Dee Ellis. Social Security Administration served on 3/8/2017.(Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/23 8:37 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/2017. (jak) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/22 10:18 AM
ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis1 . The Clerk will issue summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/22/2017. (lej) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 02/22 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Dee Dee Ellis.(jak) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dee Dee Ellis. (jak) |