Whaley v. Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00027 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lincoln Financial Group
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Whaley
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 02 2018
JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/2/2018. (jak) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Tue 01/02 1:21 PM
JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/2/2018. (jak) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/02 6:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Lawsuit With Prejudice by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company, Lincoln Financial Group, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Scannapieco, John) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/26 1:59 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER-ERISA CASE. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/26/2017. (slb) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 10/26 1:55 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint status report, No. 13 , noted and appreciated. The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule and commends their work toward a settlement. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/26/2017. (slb) (Docket text modified on 10/26/2017 to correct a typographical error)(jak) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Wed 10/25 4:35 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Scannapieco, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 10/10 4:15 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Briefing on the ERISA issue was supposed to start 18 August 2017. No briefs have been filed. Joint status report due by 18 October 2017 updating the Court and proposing a new briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/10/2017. (slb) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 07/21 3:33 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The embedded motion for a briefing schedule is granted as outlined in the parties Rule 26(f) report, No. 10 , p. 2. The Court suspends the Initial Scheduling Order, No. 9, and will issue an Amended Initial Scheduling Order or Final Scheduling Order after deciding whether ERISA applies. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/21/2017. (slb) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 07/20 7:28 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company, Lincoln Financial Group, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Joint) (Scannapieco, John) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 4:52 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2017. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/5/2017. (slb) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/01 9:48 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Scannapieco, John) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/16 4:03 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. 6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 29 May 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2017. (slb) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/15 12:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, or to otherwise respond to the Complaint by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company, Lincoln Financial Group, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(Scannapieco, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/26 2:19 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. 3 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 15 May 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/26/2017. (slb) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Scannapieco on behalf of Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company, Lincoln Financial Group, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Scannapieco, John) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/25 10:23 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other response to Complaint by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company, Lincoln Financial Group, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(Scannapieco, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Receipt Filed
Tue 02/21 12:10 PM
RECEIPT FILED: $ 400.00, receipt number LIT060586. (alm) |
|
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 02/21 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Whaley(Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service).(jak) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |