Miller et al v. Exel Inc et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian S Miller |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Deutsche Post DHL Group
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
Evergreen Logistics Business
|
|
Defendant
Exel Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Clark Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DPWN Holdings (USA) Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deutsche Post AG
|
|
Defendant
Deutsche Post Beteiligungen Holding GmbH
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phyllis Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
65 | 65
order
Judgment
Wed 01/09 2:19 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with64 order entered today, this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/9/2019. (kdr) |
|
64 | 64
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion in Limine
Wed 01/09 2:18 PM
ORDER denying55 Great American Insurance Company's motion to enforce right of intervention. Doc. No.61 . The case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/9/2018. (kdr) |