Craddock v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Leon Holmes |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00042 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2017 4:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Craddock
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 24 2017
ORDER remanding this action to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Arkansas, pursuant to the joint stipulation of the parties. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2017. (ljb) |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Fri 02/24 10:47 AM
Letter to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Jefferson County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of9 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail RRR #7099 3400 0016 3859 2936. (ljb) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 02/24 10:02 AM
ORDER remanding this action to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Arkansas, pursuant to the joint stipulation of the parties. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/2017. (ljb) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/23 1:05 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by Plaintiff and Defendants by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/17 9:46 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint and6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Company. (ljb) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/17 9:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kimberly Craddock. (ljb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 02/17 9:41 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Jefferson County Circuit Judge on 1/26/17. (ljb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/17 9:39 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Kimberly Craddock. (ljb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/17 9:36 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by R. Victor Harper on behalf of Kimberly Craddock. (ljb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 9:33 AM
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kimberly Craddock. (ljb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Case Number 35CV-17-4. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT060560. (ljb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |