Caballero v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00450 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Liscano Caballero
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 01/12 4:02 PM
STIPULATED ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE EAJA granting22 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/12/2018) (svc) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 01/12 12:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees under the EAJA filed by Joe Liscano Caballero (Fouche, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulation re. EAJA award | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Thu 01/11 3:47 PM
JUDGMENT: It is, therefore, ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the final decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration ("Commissioner) is reversed, and this case is remanded to the Commissioner for further consideration. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/11/2018) (epm) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 01/11 3:44 PM
Order Accepting19 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re:15 Motion to Remand filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Defendant's15 Motion to Remand is granted; the Commissioner's decision is reversed; and this case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the magistrate judge's Report. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/11/2018) (epm) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 09/07 8:12 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION on Motion re:15 Motion to Remand filed by Nancy A Berryhill. The Commissioner's motion to reverse and remand should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/7/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply
Wed 07/05 3:21 PM
REPLY filed by Nancy A Berryhill re:15 MOTION to Remand (Paquette, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/03 12:44 PM
RESPONSE filed by Joe Liscano Caballero re:15 MOTION to Remand (Fouche, William) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 06/29 2:12 PM
ORDER re:15 Defendant's Motion to Reverse and Remand. Respondent may file a response by 7/20/2017. Movant may file a reply by 8/3/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/29/2017) (mcrd) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Remand
Thu 06/29 10:36 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by Nancy A Berryhill with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Paquette, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Appellants Brief
Tue 05/30 10:30 AM
Appellant's BRIEF by Joe Liscano Caballero. (Fouche, William) |
|
Saturday, May 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Sat 05/13 3:21 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Plaintiff's Brief. Plaintiff's brief is due by 6/23/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/13/2017) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 05/12 3:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief filed by Joe Liscano Caballero (Fouche, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability or Consent
Mon 04/24 3:21 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/24/2017) (mcrd) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 3:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Claimant shall file a brief setting forth all errors that he/she contends entitle him/her to relief by 5/24/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/24/2017) (mcrd) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 04/21 10:46 AM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Paquette, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s) | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Paquette, Lisa) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 04/21 10:25 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint,, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lisa Kate Paquette added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Paquette, Lisa) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/17 9:50 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (to correctly name the new Acting Commissioner of Social Security) against Nancy A Berryhill filed by Joe Liscano Caballero. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fouche, William) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/17 9:43 AM
Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (twd) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
Lindsay
Fri 02/17 9:23 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 02/17 8:37 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joe Liscano Caballero. (Fouche, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 7:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Liscano Caballero. (Fouche, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 7:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Joe Liscano Caballero. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8217205) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fouche, William) |