Glaspie v. Cricket Wireless et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00458 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cricket Wireless
|
|
Defendant
Jessa NLN
|
|
Defendant
Ram NLN
|
|
Defendant
Samantha NLN
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Glaspie
1925 Village Way
Dallas, TX 75216 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Wed 06/21 11:28 AM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that the this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under FRCvP 12(h)(3) and 41(b). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/21/2017) (twd) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 06/21 11:24 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/21/2017) (twd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/21 11:29 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Wed Jun 21 11:29:14 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 05/31 3:54 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to FRCvP 12(h)(3) and FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/31/2017) (twd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/31 4:08 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed May 31 16:08:06 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 02/21 11:56 AM
ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION: The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to file no later than 3/23/2017 a written response to this order to show the Court it has subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/21/2017) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 11:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Feb 21 11:57:22 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 02/17 1:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Glaspie. (epm) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Cricket Wireless, Jessa NLN, Ram NLN, Samantha NLN filed by Kevin Glaspie. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 02/17 1:11 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Fish
Fri 02/17 1:10 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/17 1:15 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Feb 17 13:15:01 CST 2017 (crt) |