Norman v. USA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00467 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | May 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Petitioner
Alexis C Norman
|
|
Respondent
USA
|
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 06/03 4:26 PM
ORDER of USCA as to41 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alexis C Norman. Motion for a COA is DENIED. (axm) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Wed 12/19 2:56 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-10889 : Record consisting of: 3 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 5 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 3,5,37,39,40-42,44,50,52,71,77,83,84,86-88 (circuit approval is required for access), 1 Electronic Presentence Report/SOR certified to USCA. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (svc) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 12/19 2:58 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of ROA Certification Wed Dec 19 14:58:46 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability
Fri 08/24 10:56 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot42 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The District Court previously denied a certificate of appealability in this case39 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/24/2018) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/19 12:20 PM
USCA Case Number 18-10889 in USCA5 for41 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexis C Norman. (svc) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/11 8:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting43 Norman's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/11/2018) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/10 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with certificate of trust account re41 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexis C Norman. (epm) |
|
42 | 42
motion
Certificate of Appealability
Tue 07/10 2:11 PM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability on appeal re41 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexis C Norman. (epm) |
|
41 | 41
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/10 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to40 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit by Alexis C Norman. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 07/10 2:09 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:41. T.O. forms mailed also. Tue Jul 10 14:09:05 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/12 10:27 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:39, 40. Tue Jun 12 10:27:14 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment
Tue 06/12 10:25 AM
JUDGMENT: The motion to vacate, set-aside or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/11/2018) (axm) |
|
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 06/12 10:23 AM
Order Accepting29 Findings and Recommendations and Denying Certificate of Appealability. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/12/2018) (axm) Modified filed date on 6/12/2018 (axm) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Fri 05/18 11:24 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court VACATES its Order & Judgement Docs. 35 & 36. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/18/2018) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) Modified docket text on 5/18/2018 (zkc) |
|
37 | 37
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Fri 05/18 10:19 AM
OBJECTION to29 Findings and Recommendations by Alexis C Norman. (zkc) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Judgment
Thu 05/17 9:41 AM
JUDGMENT: The motion to vacate, set-aside or correct sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/17/2018) (zkc) |
|
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 05/17 9:40 AM
Order Accepting29 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court DENIES a certificate of appealability. In the event Movant will file a notice of appeal, the court notes that she must pay the $505.00 appellate filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/17/2018) (zkc) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order
Thu 05/17 9:27 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court Vacates its Order 33. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/17/2018) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order
Thu 05/17 8:43 AM
***VACATED PER 34 ORDER*** ELECTRONIC ORDER: Given the stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/17/2018) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) Modified on 5/17/2018 (zkc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 05/17 11:24 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 35, 36. Thu May 17 11:24:53 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 05/14 12:32 PM
ORDER: Norman's motion for motion for appointment of counsel, Doc.31 , is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/14/2018) (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/14 12:33 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:32. Mon May 14 12:33:04 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 05/02 1:07 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Alexis C Norman. (epm) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/30 9:07 AM
ORDER denying25 motion for discovery; denying27 motion for an evidentiary hearing; denying28 motion for release pending review of her section 2255 motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/30/2018) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/30 9:08 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Mon Apr 30 09:08:40 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/30 10:15 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:29. Mon Apr 30 10:15:32 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 04/27 11:46 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:2 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. It is recommended that the motion to vacate sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 be DENIED as meritless and Normans claims be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/27/2018) (epm) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/15 3:39 PM
MOTION for Release Pending Review of Habeas Proceeding filed by Alexis C Norman. |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Hearing
Fri 03/09 9:26 AM
MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Alexis C Norman. (axm) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 09/06 11:47 AM
Memorandum of Law and Facts filed by Alexis C Norman re25 Motion for Second Request to Compel Discovery under Rule 6 Governing 2255 Proceedings. (ran) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Compel
Wed 09/06 11:45 AM
MOTION for Second Request to Compel Discovery under Rule 6 Governing 2255 Proceedings, filed by Alexis C Norman. (ran) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Reply
Wed 09/06 11:42 AM
REPLY filed by Alexis C Norman re:11 Response. (ran) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 08/10 12:28 PM
ORDER: Movant's conclusory motion21 fails to identify any extraordinary and compelling reason to permit her to file a reply brief that exceeds the page limit set by the local rules, and it is DENIED. Movant may file a brief that meets the standard in Local Rule 7.2(c). Her request for an extension of time to do so is GRANTED. Movants reply brief is now due by September 8, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/10/2017) (mcrd) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/10 12:24 PM
ORDER DENYING Motion14 to Have Deemed Admitted Certain Applications Under Rule 8(b)(6) filed by Alexis C Norman; DENYING Motion15 o Compel Discovery filed by Alexis C Norman; DENYING Motion16 to Request the Government to Submit Documents to the Court, filed by Alexis C Norman; DENYING Motion17 to Compel a Response from the United States Probation Office filed by Alexis C Norman; DENYING Motion18 for Second Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to11 Response/Objection filed by Alexis C Norman.; DENYING Motion19 to Compel Special Assistant United States Attorney Douglas Burton Brasher to Respond filed by Alexis C Norman. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/10/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 08/10 12:28 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22, 23. Thu Aug 10 12:28:54 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File
Tue 07/25 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Alexis C Norman. (ndt) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/21 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Alexis C Norman. New address: Mansfield Law Enforcement, 1601 Heritage Parkway, Mansfield TX 76063. (ndt) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Compel
Fri 07/14 12:33 PM
MOTION to Compel Special Assistant United States Attorney Douglas Burton Brasher to Respond filed by Alexis C Norman. (sss) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/11 2:12 PM
MOTION for Second Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to11 Response/Objection filed by Alexis C Norman. (ndt) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Compel
Wed 07/05 3:47 PM
MOTION to Compel a Response from the United States Probation Office filed by Alexis C Norman. |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Compel
Tue 06/27 11:57 AM
MOTION to Request the Government to Submit Documents to the Court, filed by Alexis C Norman. (ran) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Compel
Tue 06/13 12:06 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Alexis C Norman. (twd) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/13 12:04 PM
MOTION to Have Deemed Admitted Certain Applications Under Rule 8(b)(6) filed by Alexis C Norman. (twd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/13 9:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Also the sentencing transcript, documents 69 and 70 from 3:15-cr-00066-B. Tue Jun 13 09:58:04 CDT 2017 (crt) Docket text modified on 6/13/2017 (twd) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 06/13 9:27 AM
ORDER: Petitioner's10 ,12 motions to proceed in forma pauperis, for a first extension of time to file a reply, and for a copy of the sentencing transcript are GRANTED. Petitioner's reply is now due by 7/20/2017. Plaintiff's request to exceed the page-limit for her reply brief is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to being submitted simultaneously with her reply brief. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Petitioner by mail a copy of the sentencing transcript, Crim. Doc. 69 and Crim. Doc. 70, without charge, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 2250. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/9/2017) (twd) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/02 12:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondent's Brief and Request to Excess Reply Page Limit filed by Alexis C Norman. (sss) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/22 2:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by USA re:4 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Burch-DOJ, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/09 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account re: Transcript Order Request, filed by Alexis C Norman. (ran) |
|
Saturday, March 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
Sat 03/25 3:52 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Amanda R Burch-DOJ added as AUSA. (Burch-DOJ, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Tue 03/21 7:37 AM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Wes Hendrix-DOJ for USA added. Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/21/2017) (chmb) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 7:34 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . No filing fee is due for a motion to vacate sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/21/2017) (chmb) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/21 10:18 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Tue Mar 21 10:18:21 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account, filed by Alexis C Norman. (ran) |
|
5 | 5
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 03/20 11:30 AM
Memorandum in Support filed by Alexis C Norman re4 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ran) |
|
4 | 4
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Mon 03/20 11:28 AM
AMENDED MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:15-cr-00066-B-1) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ran) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 02/24 12:35 PM
ELECTRONIC Order and Notice of Deficiency: Petitioner Alexis C Norman must address the following deficiency: The motion to vacate sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 does not plead all 17 grounds for relief. Rather it includes an attachment totaling 83 pages -- 52 pages of pleadings setting out the grounds for relief and 31 pages of exhibits. Local Civil Rule 7.2(c) provides that a brief must not exceed 25 pages (excluding the table of contents and table of authorities), absent permission of the court. Therefore, Petitioner is ORDERED to submit (1) a proper section 2255 motion briefly setting out all grounds for relief, and (2) a brief in support no longer than 25 pages, by 3/24/2017. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Petitioner, with service of this Order, a standard form motion for cases filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 (labeled amended). PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b) . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/24/2017) (chmb) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Fri 02/17 4:48 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:15-cr-00066) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (twd) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Fri 02/17 4:46 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (twd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/17 4:47 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1. Fri Feb 17 16:47:09 CST 2017 (crt) |