Baker v. Cellular City LTD et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00468 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cellular City LTD
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Baker
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Spring Communications Holding Inc
Terminated: 06/05/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Fri 02/09 4:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Cellular City LTD. (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Fri 02/09 4:57 PM
Civil Case Terminated per34 Stipulation of Dismissal. (epm) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Tue 01/30 10:02 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties informed the Court that they have settled this case.32 . Therefore, the Court ORDERS the parties to file their final settlement papers by February 9, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/30/2018) (chmb) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 01/30 9:19 AM
JOINT RESPONSE re: 31 Order to Show Cause, filed by Cellular City LTD. (Stapleton, Stephen) Enhanced text on 1/30/2018 (dsr) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Tue 01/23 9:17 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: After reviewing the papers and pleadings on file, the Court notes that the parties were required to mediate this case on or before January 12, 2018.28 . The parties have not done so. Therefore, the Court ORDERS the following: By January 30, 2018, both parties must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why they have not yet attended mediation and/or filed an Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Summary. Failure to show cause or file the appropriate documents may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/23/2018) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 08/29 3:35 AM
RESPONSE filed by Randall Baker re:29 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Joint Status Report). (Braziel, J) Expanded text on 8/29/2017 (dsr) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Thu 08/24 2:16 PM
Order to Show Cause: On or before Monday, 8/28/2017, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, in writing why he did not move for conditional certification and also address whether his failure to file this motion indicates that he intends to pursue his FLSA claim as an individual plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/24/2017) (aaa) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order For ADR
Thu 07/06 2:44 PM
MEDIATION ORDER.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/12/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/6/2017) (aaa) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/05 4:57 PM
NOTICE of SELECTION OF MEDIATOR filed by Cellular City LTD (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER (FLSA): Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2017. Motions due by 3/12/2018. Discovery due by 2/16/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/12/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/6/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Mon 06/05 4:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Randall Baker. (Braziel, J) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 06/05 2:42 PM
RESPONSE filed by Spring Communications Holding Inc re:22 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Manthey, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 06/01 5:18 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cellular City LTD re:22 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Tue 05/30 12:23 PM
Order to Show Cause. Both parties must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why they have not yet updated the Court regarding arbitration Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
trial
Pretrial Disclosures
Thu 05/04 11:51 AM
Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Pretrial Disclosures filed by Cellular City LTD. (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Amended Document
Wed 04/26 1:37 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Randall Baker. Amendment to19 Status Report. This Joint Status Report Replaces The Previous Version, Which Was Filed In Error . (Forester, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/25 8:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Randall Baker. (Forester, Jesse) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Russell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/7/2017) (chmb) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 1:26 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily S. Emmons. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/7/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/06 3:45 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8328710) filed by Randall BakerAttorney Michael Russell added to party Randall Baker(pty:pla) (Russell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
15 | 15
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/06 3:23 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8328562) filed by Randall BakerAttorney Emily Emmons added to party Randall Baker(pty:pla) (Emmons, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cellular City LTD. (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Status Report Order
Tue 04/04 9:07 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/4/2017) (axm) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/03 2:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Cellular City LTD. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Stephen Charles Stapleton added to party Cellular City LTD(pty:dft) (Stapleton, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/29 4:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Spring Communications Holding Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Manthey, Ronald) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 03/20 5:25 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Cellular City, Ltd to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Cellular City's responsive pleading is now due April 4, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/20/2017) (chmb) |
|
utility
Modify Hearings/Deadlines
Tue 03/21 8:32 AM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set per 10 Order re:1 Complaint. Responses due by 4/4/2017. (ndt) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/17 2:17 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Cellular City, Ltd to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cellular City LTD. (Scott, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/16 9:43 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Defendant Spring Communications Holding, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Spring Communications Holding, Inc.'s deadline to file its responsive pleading is now March 29, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/16/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 03/15 4:27 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (or Otherwise Repond to Pl Complaint) filed by Spring Communications Holding IncAttorney Ronald E Manthey added to party Spring Communications Holding Inc(pty:dft) (Manthey, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned
Wed 03/01 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cellular City LTD ; served on 2/28/2017. (Forester, Jesse) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned
Wed 03/01 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Spring Communications Holding Inc ; served on 2/22/2017. (Forester, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/21 12:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randall Baker. (Braziel, J) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/21 8:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Cellular City LTD, Spring Communications Holding Inc. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Boyle
Tue 02/21 8:39 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cellular City, LTD, Spring Communications Holding, Inc. filed by Randall Baker. (Filer fee note- Clerk to add prior fee payment info here.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Braziel, J) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Randall Baker Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet |