RREAF Holdings LLC et al v. First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00469 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RREAF Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/27 9:09 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Dismiss and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear the party's own respective taxable costs of court. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/27/2018) (svc) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 03/26 9:04 AM
Supplemental Document by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC as to26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) (Certificate of Conference) . (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Remark
Fri 03/16 9:40 PM
ADVISORY TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL: Please file a certificate of conference for the following motion:26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC. (Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Fri 03/09 2:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 02/20 7:56 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting24 MOTION to Extend Time Properly Plead Jurisdiction filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC. Plaintiffs have 14 days from the date of this electronic order to file an amended complaint that alleges diversity of citizenship in conformity with 28 U.S.C. § 1332. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/20/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 02/20 1:03 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Properly Plead Jurisdiction filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/30 8:58 AM
ORDER: No later than 21 days from the date of this order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. § 1332; otherwise, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/30/2018) (sss) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 01/29 6:20 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/29/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Mon 01/29 4:15 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sidney A Fitzwater for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:17-CV-0469-D. (axm) |
|
Sunday, November 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response/Objection
Sun 11/26 7:30 PM
RESPONSE filed by First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC re:17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sarelson, Matthew) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 11/03 1:38 PM
Appendix in Support filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,18 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 11/03 1:35 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 11/03 1:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order For ADR
Wed 07/05 12:45 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The Court has selected the Hon. Glen M. Ashworth as the parties' mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/8/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/5/2017) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
adr
Designation of Mediator
Thu 06/29 4:43 PM
Designation of Mediator by RREAF Holdings (O&G Portfolio Number 1) LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC. (Lynch, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Wed 06/28 8:23 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the parties to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 6/30/2017, as to why they have failed to file the joint report naming a mediator. Failure to show cause in writing may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/27/2017) (twd) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/22 2:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 5/7/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 8/10/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2017. Motions due by 2/6/2018. Discovery due by 1/8/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/8/2017. Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 4/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/22/2017) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
Mon 05/08 10:37 AM
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in11 Status Report filed by RREAF Holdings LLC. (Lynch, Patrick) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/8/2017) (dss) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 05/05 4:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by RREAF Holdings LLC, and First Capital Real Estate Investments. (Lynch, Patrick) Modified filers on 5/8/2017 (epm) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/25 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Heath Cheek on behalf of First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cheek, R) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/11 4:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying7 Motion. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement and ORDERS Defendant to file written designation of local counsel no later than April 25, 2017. See N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 83.10. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/11/2017) (chmb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Status Report Order
Tue 04/11 4:39 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a status report no later than 5/5/17. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/11/2017) (ash) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/10 6:13 PM
MOTION Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Sarelson, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/10 6:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC. (Sarelson, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/10 5:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Matthew Seth Sarelson added to party First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC(pty:dft) (Sarelson, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/21 8:25 AM
Summons Issued as to First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC. (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/21 8:26 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Tue Feb 21 08:26:00 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Tue 02/21 8:24 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 6:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RREAF Holdings LLC. (Hightower, Rick) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/17 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against First Capital Real Estate Investments, LLC filed by RREAF Holdinsgs (O&G Portfolio Number 1), LLC, RREAF Holdings LLC. (Filer fee note- Clerk to add prior fee payment info here.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hightower, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) |