Jackson v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00153 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deniedra Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Mon 04/10 11:37 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that this action be, and is hereby, remanded to the County Court at Law No. 3 of Tarrant County, Texas, from which it was removed. The court further ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that plaintiff have and recover from defendant the sum of $1,000 as reasonable expenses incurred as a result of the removal of the action to this court. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/10/2017) (mpw) |
|
8 | 8
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Mon 04/10 11:36 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting6 Motion to Remand filed by Deniedra Jackson. The court ORDERS that defendant pay to plaintiff the sum of $1,000 as reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred as a result of the removal of this action. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff's motion to remand be, and is hereby, granted, and that this action be, and is hereby, remanded to the County Court at Law No. 3 of Tarrant County, Texas, from which it was removed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/10/2017) (mpw) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 04/06 4:11 PM
RESPONSE filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company re:6 MOTION to Remand. (mpw) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand
Mon 03/20 3:49 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Deniedra Jackson. (mpw) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 4:39 PM
Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the Standing Order of documents1 and2 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (mpw) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Fri 02/17 11:53 AM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 2/17/2017) (mpw) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
McBryde
Fri 02/17 11:48 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mpw) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 9:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Egeland, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No. 3, Tarrant County, case number 2017-000323-3 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8217732) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Egeland, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) L | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/17 11:53 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Fri Feb 17 11:53:43 CST 2017 (crt) |