Taylor v. Lowe's Companies Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00155 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 4:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lowe's Companies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilburn Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Wed 09/13 3:45 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to their refiling. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne, as agreed by the parties, by the party incurring same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/13/2017) (tln) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 09/13 3:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: Pending before the Court is the parties' Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (doc.13 ). After review of the motion, the Court concludes that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. All claims in this cause are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to their refiling. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/13/2017) (tln) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Mon 09/11 2:50 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Lowe's Companies Inc (Okon, Melanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/20 10:08 AM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal Documents (doc.11 ).1 After review of the motion, the Court concludes that it should be and hereby is GRANTED, in that the deadline to file the dismissal papers required by this Court's June 21, 2017 order is EXTENDED until September 12, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 7/20/2017) (edm) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/11 4:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents filed by Wilburn Taylor (Edwards, Jeff) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 06/21 3:39 PM
ORDER TO FILE DISMISSAL DOCUMENTS: On June 14, 2017, the Court was informed by counsel for Defendant that all matters in controversy between the parties have been settled in the above-styled and -numbered cause. Accordingly, the parties must file an agreed motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal due to settlement no later than July 12, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/21/2017) (edm) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order For ADR
Wed 06/21 3:36 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Gary G Berman as mediator. ADR Summary provided as Exhibit B to the order. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator.(email sent) Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/30/2017. ADR Summary form due 10/10/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/21/2017) (edm) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Designation of Mediator
Fri 06/16 2:25 PM
Designation of Mediator by Lowe's Companies Inc. (Okon, Melanie) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order For ADR
Tue 05/16 1:05 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. ADR Summary provided as Exhibit B to the order. Deadline for parties to designate a mediator is on or before 6/16/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/30/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/16/2017) (edm) |
|
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/16 12:52 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2017. Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Motions due by 7/10/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/16/2017) (edm) |
|
utility
Modify Hearings/Deadlines
Wed 05/17 10:19 AM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set per6 Scheduling Order Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2017. (edm) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/02 2:56 PM
First STATUS REPORT filed by Lowe's Companies Inc. (Hannagan, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Wed 04/12 10:17 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/12/2017) (tln) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Means
Fri 02/17 1:53 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/17 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Companies Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Companies Inc. (Okon, Melanie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 02/17 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 355th Judicial District Court, Hood County, Texas, case number C2017008 filed by Lowe's Companies Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8218539) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Okon, Melanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J |